G.L.V. International Ltd. v. Imperial Manufacturing Group
Plaintiff: G.L.V. International Ltd.
Defendant: Imperial Manufacturing Group, Imperial Manufacturing Group USA Inc. and Imperial Manufacturing Group Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01084
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.L.V. International Ltd.. Imperial Manufacturing Group USA Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Gottuso, Kyle)
November 22, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G.L.V. International Ltd.. Imperial Manufacturing Group Inc. served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Gottuso, Kyle)
November 22, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #30 Affidavit filed by G.L.V. International Ltd., #29 Affidavit filed by G.L.V. International Ltd.. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil>Service of Process> Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 21, 2019 Filing 30 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT of Service on Imperial Manufacturing Group USA Inc. by G.L.V. International Ltd.. (Gottuso, Kyle)
November 21, 2019 Filing 29 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT of Service on Imperial Manufacturing Group Inc. by G.L.V. International Ltd.. (Gottuso, Kyle)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent due by 12/11/2019.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/20/2019. (jaj)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting H. Frederick Rusche #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 18, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Imperial Manufacturing Group USA Inc., a New Brunswick Corporation. (amv)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney H. Frederick Rusche $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4027248 by on behalf of All Defendants. (Rusche, H.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Imperial Manufacturing Group USA Inc., a New Brunswick Corporation, filed by G.L.V. International Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - '085 Patent, #4 Exhibit B - 7451-2-Assignment)(Gottuso, Kyle)
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Imperial Manufacturing Group. Amendment to #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement to include Nama Holdings (2006) Ltd. as parent company. (Annis, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Schmalfeld on behalf of Imperial Manufacturing Group (Schmalfeld, Jonathan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before December 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/4/2019. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Jonathan Schmalfeld #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Schmalfeld by on behalf of Imperial Manufacturing Group. (Schmalfeld, Jonathan) $200.00 receipt #0754-4015268
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File An Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Imperial Manufacturing Group. (Annis, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imperial Manufacturing Group. (Annis, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Annis on behalf of Imperial Manufacturing Group (Annis, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Moerke on behalf of G.L.V. International Ltd. (Moerke, Katherine)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Conneely on behalf of G.L.V. International Ltd. (Conneely, Kevin)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine A. Moerke; and granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin D. Conneely. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin D. Conneely $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3996470 by on behalf of G.L.V. International Ltd.. (Conneely, Kevin)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine A. Moerke $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3996352 by on behalf of G.L.V. International Ltd.. (Moerke, Katherine)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Imperial Manufacturing Group. Original mailed to counsel for service. (amv)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 AO 120 Report of Filing (amv)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Gottuso, Kyle)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle G. Gottuso on behalf of G.L.V. International Ltd. (Gottuso, Kyle)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Gottuso does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Attorney Kyle G. Gottuso #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1084-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(amv)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by G.L.V. International Ltd.. (Gottuso, Kyle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kyle G. Gottuso $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3994561 by on behalf of G.L.V. International Ltd.. (Gottuso, Kyle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imperial Manufacturing Group ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3994541.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - '085 Patent, #4 Exhibit B - 7451-2 Assignment)(Gottuso, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.L.V. International Ltd. v. Imperial Manufacturing Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Manufacturing Group
Represented By: Michael R. Annis
Represented By: Jonathan Schmalfeld
Represented By: H. Frederick Rusche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Manufacturing Group USA Inc.
Represented By: H. Frederick Rusche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Manufacturing Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.L.V. International Ltd.
Represented By: Kyle G. Gottuso
Represented By: Kevin D. Conneely
Represented By: Katherine A. Moerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?