Brumit et al v. Granite City, Illinois
Plaintiff: Andrew Simpson and Deborah Brumit
Defendant: City of Granite City, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2019cv01090
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 24) filed by Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson. (Gedge, Samuel)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 24) by City of Granite City, Illinois. (Phillips, Erin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson. (Gedge, Samuel)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed within 14 days of this Order or before the deadline for filing dispositive motions, whichever is later. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is included for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 19-1090-SMY. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/26/19. (kdw)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING Order at Doc. #21 : This case was inadvertently selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. This case, along with the companion case Barron et al v. Granite City, Illinois, Case No. 19-834-SMY, shall remain with the undersigned District Judge. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/22/2019. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 VACATED-ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent due by 12/11/2019.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/20/2019. (jaj) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jlrr).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Scheduling Conference by Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson. (Gedge, Samuel)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Granite City, Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Phillips, Erin)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Granite City, Illinois. Responses due by 12/5/2019 (Phillips, Erin)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Granite City, Illinois. (Phillips, Erin)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing: In light of the Order entered at Doc. 15, the Hearing set for October 23, 2019 is VACATED.(slh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #8 ) and the Joint Motion for Agreed Order on Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #14 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/18/2019. (mah)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Order tofor Agreed Order on Preliminary Injunction by City of Granite City, Illinois. (Phillips, Erin)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Doc. #5 ): This case is one of two cases pending before this Court challenging the constitutionality of Defendant City of Granite City, Illinois' compulsory-eviction statute. In each case, Plaintiffs move for temporary and preliminary injunctive relief enjoining the City from enforcing its compulsory-eviction statute. To preserve judicial resources, the Court will grant the motion for purposes of the scheduled hearing on Plaintiffs' motions for preliminary injunction. The Court will hold its ruling on full consolidation in abeyance until the issue has been fully briefed by the parties. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/9/2019. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Simpson, Deborah Brumit (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED in part. See Order for details. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby set for hearing on October 23, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in the Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/9/2019. (mah)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley C. Young on behalf of City of Granite City, Illinois (Young, Bradley)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M. Phillips on behalf of City of Granite City, Illinois (Phillips, Erin)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson. City of Granite City, Illinois served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Gedge, Samuel)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Samuel B. Gedge in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Gedge Declaration, #3 Affidavit of Clayton Baker in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit Rule 65(b)(1)(B) Certification of Notice)(Gedge, Samuel)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Granite City, Illinois and original mailed to Attorney Gedge. (kek)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1090-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson. (Gedge, Samuel)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart C. Sullivan on behalf of Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson (Sullivan, Bart)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James McNamara on behalf of Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson (McNamara, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Gedge on behalf of Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson (Gedge, Samuel)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Granite City, Illinois ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3995431.), filed by Deborah Brumit, Andrew Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to The City of Granite City, Illinois)(Gedge, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumit et al v. Granite City, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Simpson
Represented By: Samuel B. Gedge
Represented By: Bart C. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert James McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Brumit
Represented By: Samuel B. Gedge
Represented By: Bart C. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert James McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Granite City, Illinois
Represented By: Erin M. Phillips
Represented By: Bradley C. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?