Cureton v. USA
Petitioner: Thomas Cureton
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01107
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke J. Weissler on behalf of USA (Weissler, Luke)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Petitioner Thomas Cureton has filed a pro se motion to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Without commenting on the merits of Petitioner's claims, the Court concludes that the petition survives preliminary review under Rule 4. Consequently, the Government is DIRECTED to file a response to the petition within THIRTY (30) days of this Order. The Government shall, as part of its response, attach all relevant portions of the record. After the Government files its response, Petitioner will have THIRTY (30) days to file a reply. If review of the briefs indicates that an evidentiary hearing is warranted, the Court will immediately set the hearing by separate notice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/18/2019. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. File marked copies of document 1, including letter to AUSA, sent to Petitioner this date, as return copies and SASE provided. Post office returned as a security concern. (see envelope) (amv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Thomas Cureton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law - Part 1, #2 Memorandum of Law - Part 2, #3 Letter to AUSA)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cureton v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Donald S. Boyce
Represented By: Luke J. Weissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Cureton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?