USA v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: State of Illinois Department of Revenue, City of Harrisburg, Illinois and Marilyn F. Roberts
Case Number: 3:2019cv01170
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Marilyn F. Roberts. (cds)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Harrisburg, Illinois. (cds)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed within 14 days of this Order or before the deadline for filing dispositive motions, whichever is later. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is included for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 19-1170-SMY. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/26/19. (kdw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. State of Illinois Department of Revenue waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1170-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Harrisburg, Illinois, Marilyn F. Roberts, State of Illinois Department of Revenue, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Harrisburg, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn F. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?