Tomelleri v. Logan Hollow Fish Farm, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Tomilleri and Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Logan Hollow Farms, LLC and Logan Hollow Fish Farm, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01235
Filed: November 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 AO121 - Order Dismissing Case and Final Judgment mailed to Register of Copyrights this date. (rah)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/6/2020. (anb2)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #10 ) filed by Plaintiff: Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), a plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Because the opposing party in this case has neither filed an answer nor a motion for summary judgment, Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal is effective immediately upon filing and does not require judicial approval. See Nelson v. Napolitano, 657 F.3d 586 (7th Cir. 2011). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the case on the Court's docket. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/6/2020. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Maguire, Oliver)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. This Notice is being entered because (1) one or more parties failed to respond to the Court's directive to submit a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form and/or (2) this action includes Doe Defendants and/or Defendants who have not been served and, therefore, cannot submit a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form at this time. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-1235-NJR. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. The 21-day deadline set forth in this Order does not apply to unserved parties. Deadlines for newly served parties to consent or decline to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge will be set by the Court at a later date. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/2/2019. (tba)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Oliver P. Maguire. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Joseph R. Tomelleri by Attorney Oliver P. Maguire $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4025464 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Maguire, Oliver)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 AO121 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed, including copy of Complaint, to Register of Copyrights this date. (rah)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Berwin on behalf of Joseph R. Tomelleri (Berwin, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, ortransferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Berwin does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1235-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(rah)
November 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Logan Hollow Fish Farm, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0754-4022867.), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berwin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Logan Hollow Fish Farm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tomilleri
Represented By: David C. Berwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: David C. Berwin
Represented By: Oliver P. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Hollow Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Hollow Fish Farm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?