Greer-Storment et al v. Traveler's Indemnity Company, Inc
Plaintiff: Paul M. Storment, Jr. and Joann Greer-Storment
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Inc. and Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01309
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE to Paul Storment STRIKING PLEADING: : The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete and the incorrect filing event was used. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("et al" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible using the event Civil>Other Documents>Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 2/6/2020. (tba)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. District Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Joann Greer-Storment, Paul M. Storment, Jr., Travelers Indemnity Company, Inc., and Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-1309-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/6/2020. (trb).
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Storment, Paul)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Orlando, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas B. Orlando on behalf of Defendant The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Storment, Paul)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas B. Orlando $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4050107 by on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Orlando, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Ponzi, Matthew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1309-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Ponzi on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Ponzi, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 19-AR-0813 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4040993), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ponzi, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer-Storment et al v. Traveler's Indemnity Company, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Storment, Jr.
Represented By: Paul M. Storment, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Greer-Storment
Represented By: Paul M. Storment, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S. Ponzi
Represented By: Thomas B. Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?