Tschetter v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Tschetter
Defendant: AbbVie Inc. and Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01316
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's motion to approve settlement by Cynthia Tschetter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Rosemond, George)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEALED ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/8/2020. (dhg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Sealed Document Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Cynthia Tschetter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Rosemond, George)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1316-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (amv)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George Erick Rosemond on behalf of Cynthia Tschetter (Rosemond, George)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories Inc., filed by Cynthia Tschetter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosemond, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tschetter v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Tschetter
Represented By: George Erick Rosemond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Martin R. Martos, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?