Ceres Consulting, L.L.C. v. Genesis Venture Logistics, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Ceres Consulting, L.L.C. and Ceres Consulting L.L.C.
Defendant: Arrow Marine, L.L.C., KZM Marine Services, LLC, Genesis Venture Logistics, L.L.C., Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC and Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01345
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Ceres Consulting L.L.C. by KZM Marine Services, LLC.(Morse, Harry)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Harry E. Morse, VI. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 28, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Harry E. Morse, VI $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4099632 by on behalf of KZM Marine Services, LLC. (Morse, Harry)
January 27, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc.. (Schoepke, Richard)
January 27, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint Answer to First Amended Interpleader Complaint by Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc..(Schoepke, Richard)
January 24, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. (Miller, Bobby)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard Jeremy Schoepke. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission by Attorney Richard Jeremy Schoepke $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4093558 by on behalf of Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc.. (Schoepke, Richard)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. Genesis Venture Logistics, L.L.C. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Miller, Bobby)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. Arrow Marine, L.L.C. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Miller, Bobby)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Miller, Bobby)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. KZM Marine Services, LLC served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Miller, Bobby)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc. served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Miller, Bobby)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC, Arrow Marine, L.L.C., Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc., Genesis Venture Logistics, L.L.C., KZM Marine Services, LLC. (cds)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested. (Miller, Bobby)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C..(Miller, Bobby)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JURISDICTIONAL ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte on the issue of federal subject matter jurisdiction. See Foster v. Hill, 497 F.3d 695, 696-97 (7th Cir. 2007) ("It is the responsibility of a court to make an independent evaluation of whether subject matter jurisdiction exists in every case."). Plaintiff Ceres Consulting LLC alleges that one of its members is a resident of Missouri and the other a resident of Illinois (Doc. #1 , p. 2). Residence and citizenship are not synonyms and it is the latter that matters for purposes of the diversity jurisdiction. Meyerson v. Harrahs E. Chicago Casino, 299 F.3d 616, 617 (7th Cir. 2002). Additionally, citizenship of an LLC for diversity purposes is the citizenship of each of its members. See, e.g., Copeland v. Penske Logistics, LLC, 675 F.3d 1040, 1043 (7th Cir. 2012). Plaintiff did not allege the members or citizenship of the members for any of the Defendant LLCs. Furthermore, for corporations, the state of incorporation and the principal place of business must be alleged in the complaint. McMillian v. Sheraton Chicago Hotel & Towers, 567 F.3d 839, 845 n.10 (7th Cir. 2009), quoting 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1). In order to correctly assert the basis of this Court's subject matter jurisdiction, Plaintiff will need to specifically allege the principal place of business for Defendant Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint that corrects the defects in its pleading of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. The Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than January 17, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/18/2019. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: A party to this action has declined to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Accordingly, pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 19-1345-NJR. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Crane, Allan)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Allan C. Crane. (rah)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Allan C. Crane $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4056194 by on behalf of Ceres Consulting, L.L.C.. (Crane, Allan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby R. Miller, Jr on behalf of Ceres Consulting, L.L.C. (Miller, Bobby)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, ortransferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Miller does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1345-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(rah)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC, Arrow Marine, L.L.C., Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc., Genesis Venture Logistics, L.L.C., KZM Marine Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4053557.), filed by Ceres Consulting, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Bobby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceres Consulting, L.L.C. v. Genesis Venture Logistics, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Marine, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KZM Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: Harry E. Morse, VI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Venture Logistics, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerifactors Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choctaw Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Jeremy Schoepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceres Consulting, L.L.C.
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceres Consulting L.L.C.
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Allan C. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?