Chatman v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Renee Chatman
Defendant: Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01363
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #24 Notice of Appearance filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice of Appearance is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia R. Zousmer on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zousmer, Julia)
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By 30 Days by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Zousmer, Julia)
February 10, 2020 Filing 22 Case Reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel no longer assigned to the case. (kls3)
February 7, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-1363-NJR. (kls3)
February 6, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lauricella, Noah)
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #18 Notice (Other) filed by Renee Chatman. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents." E-filer is instructed to re-file in order to properly file and seal the document. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 STRICKEN. NOTICE by Renee Chatman Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Lauricella, Noah) Modified on 2/6/2020 (kls3).
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. District Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Renee Chatman. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-1363-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due 2/6/2020.(lmb)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/19/2019. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 Summonses Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC; and returned to Attorney Lauricella for service. (kls3)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Requested. (Lauricella, Noah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Requested. (Lauricella, Noah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Requested. (Lauricella, Noah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested. (Lauricella, Noah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Requested. (Lauricella, Noah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #8 Exhibit filed by Renee Chatman.Text entry modified to reflect that document is the SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT by Renee Chatman. Exhibit to #1 Complaint Second Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Lauricella, Noah) Modified on 12/18/2019 (kls3).
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #4 Exhibit filed by Renee Chatman, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Renee Chatman, #6 Exhibit filed by Renee Chatman. These documents are all fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF documents before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Complaint Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Lauricella, Noah)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah C. Lauricella on behalf of Renee Chatman (Lauricella, Noah)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by Renee Chatman. Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Lauricella, Noah)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover Sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil>Other Documents>Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry.NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the Court. Attorney Lauricella does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-1363-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kls3)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4061336.), filed by Renee Chatman.(Lauricella, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Chatman
Represented By: Noah C. Lauricella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Julia R. Zousmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?