Garber et al v. Lorenzini & Associates, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Garber and Sherry Helgoe
Defendant: Lorenzini & Associates, LTD., Eric A Freeland and Ronald N Lorenzini, Jr
Case Number: 3:2020cv00025
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Eric Freeland's Request to Admit filed by Ronald Garber. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bruck, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Telephone Scheduling Conference before Judge Beatty on 4/29/2020. (jmj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 3, 2020 Filing 30 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Jochum, Jason)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-25-SMY. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2020 Filing 28 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Blair, Kimberly)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted, enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 4629. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 3/17/2020. (arf)
March 17, 2020 Filing 26 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Presumptive Jury Trial month set for March 2021 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. (arf)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly recused. Through random draw, the Clerk of Court has reassigned this matter to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for all further proceedings. All further documents shall bear the case number 20-cv-25-MAB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 3/12/2020. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Eric Freeland to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Eric Freeland on 3/12/20. Consent due by 4/2/2020. (rah)
March 11, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eric A Freeland.(Jochum, Jason)
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Ronald N Lorenzini, Jr., Lorenzini & Associates, LTD to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Ronald N Lorenzini, Jr., Lorenzini & Associates, LTD on 3/11/20. Consent due by 4/1/2020. (rah)
March 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #18 Answer to Complaint filed by Eric A Freeland. CM/ECF login credentials used and signature on the filed document do not match. Document must be re-filed with CM/ECF login credentials consistent with the attorney whose signature appears on the document. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Kimberly E. Rients Blair. Notice of Appearance is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. Further, filer is advised to caption all further pleadings with the correct case number of 20-cv-25-RJD. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony G. Barone on behalf of Eric A Freeland (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Barone, Anthony)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 STRICKEN - Eric Freeland's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eric A Freeland.(Barone, Anthony) Modified on 3/11/2020 (rah).
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lorenzini & Associates, LTD.. (Blair, Kimberly)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ronald N Lorenzini, Jr, Lorenzini & Associates, LTD..(Blair, Kimberly)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly E. Rients Blair on behalf of Ronald N Lorenzini, Jr, Lorenzini & Associates, LTD. (Blair, Kimberly)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ronald N Lorenzini, Jr waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020; Lorenzini & Associates, LTD. waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Bruck, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Eric A Freeland waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Bruck, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony G. Barone; #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason W. Jochum; and #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Zachary James McGourty. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Zachary James McGourty $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4112799 by on behalf of Eric A Freeland. (McGourty, Zachary)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason W. Jochum $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4112791 by on behalf of Eric A Freeland. (Jochum, Jason)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony G. Barone $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4112783 by on behalf of Eric A Freeland. (Barone, Anthony)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 7 Notice filed by Ronald Garber, Sherry Helgoe. Incorrect event used. The correct event for this document is found at Civil>Other Filings>Other Documents>Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. Document text and security restriction modified by Clerk's Office. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. District Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Ronald Garber, Sherry Helgoe. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-25-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due 2/5/2020.(lmb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Dagley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dagley, Jessica)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cleary Bruck on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bruck, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, ortransferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Michael Bruck does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-25-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(rah)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Legal Malpractice against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4079564.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruck, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garber et al v. Lorenzini & Associates, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Garber
Represented By: Michael Cleary Bruck
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Dagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Helgoe
Represented By: Michael Cleary Bruck
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Dagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzini & Associates, LTD.
Represented By: Kimberly E. Rients Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A Freeland
Represented By: Jason W. Jochum
Represented By: Anthony G. Barone
Represented By: Zachary James McGourty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald N Lorenzini, Jr
Represented By: Kimberly E. Rients Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?