Burdette v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lindsey Jo Burdette
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00069
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 260, this case is transferred from Magistrate Donald G. Wilkerson and reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. All deadlines and schedules previously set by or before Magistrate G. Wilkerson shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-69-JPG-MAB. (trb)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Olinsky, Howard)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Howard D. Olinsky. (tba)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lindsey Jo Burdette. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/21/2020. (jdh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-00069-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (tba)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Lindsey Jo Burdette (Olinsky, Howard)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lindsey Jo Burdette. (Olinsky, Howard)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lindsey Jo Burdette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdette v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Jo Burdette
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?