Kyriakidis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Panayiota P. Kyriakidis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00197
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Schwartz on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Schwartz, Alison)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (lmb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 3/31/2020 (lmb).
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 260, this case is transferred from Magistrate Donald G. Wilkerson and reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. All deadlines and schedules previously set by or before Magistrate G. Wilkerson shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-197-JPG-MAB. (trb)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (cds)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Panayiota P. Kyriakidis. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/21/2020. (jdh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-197-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (cds)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Camp, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Panayiota P. Kyriakidis. (Camp, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Camp on behalf of Panayiota P. Kyriakidis (Camp, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Panayiota P. Kyriakidis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyriakidis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Represented By: Alison Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panayiota P. Kyriakidis
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?