Brown v. Warden
Petitioner: Frankie Brown
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2020cv00201
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT by Frankie Brown. Supplement to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jaj)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ) based on the financial information provided with his motion. According to Petitioner's motion, he received $994.00 in deposits during the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this case, which is sufficient to cover the $5.00 filing fee. Accordingly, Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee in this case not later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order. Payment of the $5.00 filing fee shall be sent to: United States District Court, Clerk's Office, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois, 62201. At the time payment is made, Petitioner's name and the case number assigned to this action shall be clearly identified. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/12/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frankie Brown. (jaj)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel and to move prisons by Frankie Brown. (jaj)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Your case number is 20-201-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $5.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/20/2020. (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frankie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?