Stone v. Corrigan Brothers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Stone
Defendant: Corrigan Brothers Company, Dennis Corrigan, Jim Corrigan, Dawn Wallace, Corrigan Brothers, Inc. and Dawn Carpenter
Case Number: 3:2020cv00261
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 23 Order. Docket text reflects the incorrect year. Docket text has been modified to reflect the correct date of May 18, 2020.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #22 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's responses to the Motions to Dismiss are due by May 18, 2020 Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/8/2020. (dah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 5/8/2020 (kdw).
May 7, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time by Michael Stone. (Baricevic, Charles)
April 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael Stone. Responses due by 5/14/2020 (Baricevic, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-261-SMY. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Baricevic, Charles)
April 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Baricevic on behalf of Michael Stone (Baricevic, Charles)
April 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Deadline to Respond to Count I by Corrigan Brothers Company, Corrigan Brothers, Inc.. (Golterman, Robert)
April 7, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dennis Corrigan, Jim Corrigan, Corrigan Brothers Company, Corrigan Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golterman, Robert)
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Dennis Corrigan, Jim Corrigan, Corrigan Brothers Company, Corrigan Brothers, Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Golterman, Robert)
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dawn Carpenter, Dawn Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golterman, Robert)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Dawn Carpenter, Dawn Wallace. Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Golterman, Robert)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Michael Stone to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Michael Stone on 4/1/2020. Consent due by 4/22/2020 (trb)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ACTION See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Baricevic does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Armstrong, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Defendants Notice of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Golterman, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ALLOWS Defendants up to and including April 7, 2020 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 3/11/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Golterman, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Dawn Carpenter, Dennis Corrigan, Jim Corrigan, Corrigan Brothers Company, Corrigan Brothers, Inc., Michael Stone, Dawn Wallace. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-261-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 3/31/2020 (trb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff (Golterman, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Armstrong on behalf of All Defendants (Armstrong, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Golterman on behalf of All Defendants (Golterman, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Defendants. (Golterman, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Madison County, ILL, case number 2020L000116 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4136648), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Golterman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Corrigan Brothers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stone
Represented By: Charles J Baricevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrigan Brothers Company
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Corrigan
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Corrigan
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Wallace
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrigan Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Carpenter
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?