Merkle et al v. BASF Catalysts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn K. Merkle and Jack T. Merkle
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Honeywell International, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, BWDAC, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Morse Tec LLC, DCO, LLC, BASF Catalysts, LLC, Imo Industries, Inc., Western Auto Supply Company, DAP Products Inc., Navistar, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Genuine Parts Company and Red Devil, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00315
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 20 Letter of Acknowledgment from Madison County, IL Circuit Court (rah)
May 13, 2020 Filing 19 Letter to Madison County, IL State Court regarding Order Remanding Case (rah)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REMAND: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. #15 ). Case remanded to the Circuit Court for the Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/12/2020. (anb2)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Because Plaintiffs filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. #16 ) that asserts no claims against Northrop Grumman Corp., Northrop has been terminated from this action and its Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/8/2020. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against BASF Catalysts, LLC, BWDAC, Inc., DCO, LLC, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Honeywell International, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Morse Tec LLC, Western Auto Supply Company, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Steffan, John)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Steffan, John)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs as to Defendant Northrop Grumman Corp. (Doc. #12 ): Plaintiffs filed a notice of voluntary dismissal, indicating their claims against Northrop may be dismissed. However, a plain reading of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) suggests that dismissal under this rule should be used only to dismiss an ENTIRE ACTION (rather than a particular claim against a particular defendant). See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F.3d 851, 857 (7th Cir. 2015) (Rule 41(a) is "limited to dismissal of an entire action" and Rule 15(a) is the proper vehicle for "adding or dropping parties and claims"). The rule cannot be used to cleave away one claim or one party from a larger case. Id. To be clear, Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #12 ), therefore, has not automatically terminated Northrop as it would under applicable circumstances. Accordingly, Northrop will remain a defendant in this matter, and its Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ), active, until Plaintiffs amend their Complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a), which they can do as of right in some circumstances and on motion in others. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amended complaint that dismisses Northrop on or before May 6, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/6/2020. (anb2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-315-NJR. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Steffan, John)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Steffan, John)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Louis Steffan, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steffan, John)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Northrop Grumman Corporation. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Odom, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT by Northrop Grumman Corporation. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal . (Odom, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to Attorney Steven D. Rineberg regarding admission to ILSD (rah)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation. Notice of Removal was filed without the required attorney signature on the document. Filer is directed to file a signed Notice of Removal using Other Filings>Other Documents>Exhibit and linking the filing to Document 1. It is not necessary to re-file the state court complaint or the civil cover sheet. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Northrop Grumman Corporation. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-315-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 4/17/2020. (rah)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northrup Grumman identifying Other Affiliate Northrup Grumman for Northrup Grumman. (Odom, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan C. Kane on behalf of Northrup Grumman (Kane, Meghan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Odom, II on behalf of Northrup Grumman (Odom, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4149467), filed by Northrup Grumman. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Odom, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merkle et al v. BASF Catalysts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Gregory W. Odom, II
Represented By: Meghan C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Catalysts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Devil, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn K. Merkle
Represented By: Steven D. Rineberg
Represented By: John Louis Steffan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack T. Merkle
Represented By: Steven D. Rineberg
Represented By: John Louis Steffan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?