Harvey, Jr. v. Wexford Health Sources et al
Plaintiff: Bryant Harvey, Jr.
Defendant: Shelia Lewis, Lt. DeWeese, Michael Remmers, DeeDee Brookhart, Rob Jeffreys, Lt. Eckleberry, C/O Carter, C/O Goble, C/O Perkins, C/O Kelly, John Baldwin, Wexford Health Sources, C/O Marshall, Lt. McDonald, Matt Boesecker, Lacie Livingston, Merrill J. Zahtz, Sgt. Ackerman, Russell Goins, Lorie Cunningham, Amber Allen, C/O Fiero, John Varga and Tammy Welty
Case Number: 3:2020cv00384
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Amber Allen waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020; Michael Remmers waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (tjk)
June 19, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanine R. Armstrong on behalf of Amber Allen, Michael Remmers (Armstrong, Jeanine)
June 18, 2020 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $45.10 received, receipt number 34625102116 (rah)
June 16, 2020 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/16/2020. Charles David Goerisch and Thomas Hunter Brown participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Jaclyn Kincade and Jeanine Armstrong participated on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED AS MOOT, without prejudice to re-filing. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 16, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanine R. Armstrong on behalf of John Varga (Armstrong, Jeanine)
June 16, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wexford Health Sources.(Kinkade, Jaclyn)
June 15, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE by Sgt. Ackerman, John Baldwin, Matt Boesecker, DeeDee Brookhart, C/O Carter, Lorie Cunningham, Lt. DeWeese, Lt. Eckleberry, C/O Goble, Russell Goins, Rob Jeffreys, C/O Kelly, Shelia Lewis, C/O Marshall, C/O Perkins of Plaintiff's Release (Armstrong, Jeanine)
June 12, 2020 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed John Varga waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (tjk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Merrill J. Zahtz waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (tjk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/9/2020. Charles David Goerisch, Thomas Hunter Brown, Jaclyn Kinkade, and Jeanine Armstrong participated. The next Telephonic Status Conference is SET for 6/16/2020 at 1:30 PM with Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 9557 (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Due to continued technical difficulties with the video connection at Lawrence Correctional Center, the Court CONVERTS the hearing scheduled for June 9, 2020 at 1:30 PM to a telephone conference. Counsel should be prepared to update the Court on the status of this matter and to discuss how to proceed in light of the technical difficulties. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 9342. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/9/2020. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 5, 2020 Filing 58 AMENDED VIDEO WRIT ISSUED as to Bryant Harvey Jr. M51717 to be held June 9, 2020 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (drb)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED ORDER: ORDER: While the federal courthouse is currently closed to the public pursuant to the Second Amended Administrative Order #266 (dated May 29, 2020), the hearing as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction RESET for June 9, 2020 at 1:30 PM will be held by video conference. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus and per the other reasons set forth in the Second Amended Administrative Order #266, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Instructions to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 1-877-336-1831, when prompted enter Access Code 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/5/2020. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER: Due to technical issues, the hearing as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Restraining Order is RESET for June 9, 2020 at 1:30 PM via video conference. IDOC and the Warden of Lawrence Correctional Center shall arrange to have Bryant Harvey, Jr. M51717 present by video conference at that date/time. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/5/2020. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: While the federal courthouse is currently closed to the public pursuant to the Second Amended Administrative Order #266 (dated May 29, 2020), the hearing as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for June 5, 2020 at 2:30 PM will be held by video conference. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus and per the other reasons set forth in the Second Amended Administrative Order #266, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Instructions to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 1-877-336-1831, when prompted enter Access Code 9139610. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/5/2020. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 4, 2020 Filing 53 EXHIBIT by Wexford Health Sources. Exhibit to #36 Response to Motion Exhibit C. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff by Attorney Thomas Hunter Brown $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4196409 by on behalf of Bryant Harvey, Jr. (Brown, Thomas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanine R. Armstrong on behalf of Sgt. Ackerman, Matt Boesecker, DeeDee Brookhart, C/O Carter, Lorie Cunningham, Lt. DeWeese, Lt. Eckleberry, C/O Goble, Russell Goins, C/O Kelly, Shelia Lewis, C/O Marshall, Lt. McDonald, C/O Perkins (Armstrong, Jeanine)
June 2, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bryant Harvey, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goerisch, Charles)
June 1, 2020 Filing 49 SECOND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Varga, Remmers, Zahtz, and Allen on 6/1/2020. Waiver of Service due by 7/1/2020. (tjk)
May 28, 2020 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Sgt. Ackerman waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Matt Boesecker waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; DeeDee Brookhart waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; C/O Carter waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Lorie Cunningham waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Lt. DeWeese waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Lt. Eckleberry waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; C/O Goble waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Russell Goins waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; C/O Kelly waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Shelia Lewis waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; C/O Marshall waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Lt. McDonald waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; C/O Perkins waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (tjk)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $45.10. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Lawrence Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/27/2020. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 27, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 26, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE: A hearing as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order is SET for 6/5/2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. While the federal courthouse is currently closed to the public per the First Amended Administrative Order No. 266 (dated May 12, 2020), full access to this hearing is available remotely. Instructions to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 1-877-336-1831, when prompted enter Access Code 9139610. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus and per the other reasons set forth in the First Amended Administrative Order #266, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Reply due by 6/2/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/26/2020. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 26, 2020 Filing 43 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Goerisch, Charles)
May 26, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #36 Response to Motion, #35 Response to Motion, by Bryant Harvey, Jr. (Goerisch, Charles)
May 22, 2020 Filing 41 EXHIBIT by Wexford Health Sources. Exhibit to #36 Response to Motion Exhibit A Part 5. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 40 EXHIBIT by Wexford Health Sources. Exhibit to #36 Response to Motion Exhibit A Part 4. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 39 EXHIBIT by Wexford Health Sources. Exhibit to #36 Response to Motion Exhibit A Part 3. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 38 EXHIBIT by Wexford Health Sources. Exhibit to #36 Response to Motion Exhibit A Part 2. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 37 EXHIBIT by Wexford Health Sources. Exhibit to #36 Response to Motion Exhibit A Part 1. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wexford Health Sources. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Consent due by 5/26/2020 (tjk)
May 21, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Baldwin, Rob Jeffreys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Cunningham Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Brookhart Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Disciplinary)(Armstrong, Jeanine)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until 5/26/2020 to return his Notice and Consent form. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/21/2020. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time by Bryant Harvey, Jr. (Goerisch, Charles)
May 20, 2020 Filing 32 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due 5/22/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/15/2020. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 14, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Wexford Health Sources. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 12, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles David Goerisch on behalf of Bryant Harvey, Jr (Goerisch, Charles)
May 8, 2020 Filing 28 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Armstrong, Jeanine)
May 6, 2020 Filing 27 VIDEO WRIT ISSUED as to Bryant Harvey Jr. M51717 to be held June 5, 2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (drb)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE AND ORDER: A hearing as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order is SET for 6/5/2020 at 2:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. IDOC and the Warden of Lawrence Correctional Center shall arrange to have Bryant Harvey Jr. M51717 present via video conference at the date and time. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/6/2020. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Defendants Baldwin and Jeffreys to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Defendants Baldwin and Jeffreys on 5/6/20. Consent due by 5/27/2020 (amv)
May 5, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanine R. Armstrong on behalf of John Baldwin, Rob Jeffreys (Armstrong, Jeanine)
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Wexford Health Sources to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Wexford Health Sources on 5/5/2020. Consent due by 5/26/2020 (kls3)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/5/2020. (anp)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Protective Order HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Wexford Health Sources. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wexford Health Sources. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn A. Kinkade on behalf of Wexford Health Sources (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Dugan on behalf of Wexford Health Sources (Dugan, Timothy)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bryant Harvey, Jr. (jsm2)
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed John Baldwin waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (tjk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Wexford Health Sources waiver sent on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (tjk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to John Varga, DeeDee Brookhart, Merrill Zahtz, Lori Cunningham, Amber Allen, Michael Remmers, Sheila Lewis, Russell Goins, Tammy Welty, Matt Boesecker, C/O Kelly, Lt. Deweese, C/O Marshall, C/O Carter, C/O Goble, C/O Perkins, Lt. McDonald, Sgt. Ackerman, Lt. Eckleberry on 5/4/2020. Waiver of Service due by 6/3/2020. (tjk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Baldwin on 5/4/2020. Waiver of Service due by 6/3/2020. (tjk)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Rob Jeffreys waiver sent on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (tjk)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jeffreys on 5/1/2020. Waiver of Service due by 6/1/2020. (tjk)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wexford on 5/1/2020. Waiver of Service due by 6/1/2020. (tjk)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER assigning Attorney Charles David Goerisch for Bryant Harvey, Jr. Attorney Appearance due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/1/2020. (anp)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Service of Process upon Wexford Health Sources, John Varga, DeeDee Brookhart, Merrill Zahtz, Lori Cunningham, Amber Allen, Michael Remmers, Sheila Lewis, Russell Goins, Tammy Welty, Matt Boesecker, C/O Kelly, Lt. Deweese, C/O Marshall, C/O Carter, C/O Goble, C/O Perkins, Lt. McDonald, Sgt. Ackerman, Lt. Eckleberry, Rob Jeffreys (official and individual capacity), and John Baldwin, DENYING #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bryant Harvey, Jr., GRANTING #3 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel filed by Bryant Harvey, Jr. The Court will assign counsel by separate order. Rob Jeffreys and Wexford to respond to motion for preliminary injunction by May 15, 2020. Livingston is DISMISSED without prejudice and Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Livingston from the docket. Count 5 against C/O Fiero is SEVERED into a new case. See Order for details.. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/1/2020. (anp)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #2 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 10/1/2019 to 4/29/2020 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Lawrence Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 6/15/2020). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/30/2020. (tjk)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 04/29/2020. Consent due by 5/20/2020. (jsm2)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 20-cv-384-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/29/2020. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bryant Harvey, Jr. (jsm2)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Bryant Harvey, Jr. (jsm2)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryant Harvey, Jr.(jsm2)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bryant Harvey, Jr.(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey, Jr. v. Wexford Health Sources et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Lewis
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. DeWeese
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Remmers
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeeDee Brookhart
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Eckleberry
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Carter
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Goble
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Perkins
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Kelly
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Jaclyn A. Kinkade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Marshall
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. McDonald
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Boesecker
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacie Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill J. Zahtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ackerman
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Goins
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Cunningham
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Allen
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Fiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Varga
Represented By: Jeanine R. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Welty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Harvey, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Hunter Brown
Represented By: Charles David Goerisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?