Westfield Insurance Company v. Pepsi Midamerica Co. et al
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Charles Hall and Pepsi Midamerica Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00388
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Syregelas, Peter)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #9 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The form is incomplete. It fails to list which party is consenting or not consenting to a magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Signing the submitted portion of the form is insufficient. Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to the Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. Under Name of Party or Parties you must print the name of the party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate Judge jurisdiction. You should also sign the form under signature of party or attorney. (kdw)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Syregelas, Peter) Modified on 6/9/2020 (kdw).
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Pepsi Midamerica Co., and original mailed to Attorney Syregelas. (kdw)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to consent or to decline consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge is extended through June 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/3/2020. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to select whether it will Consent/Not Consent to having a Magistrate Judge conduct any and all proceedings by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Syregelas, Peter)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Syregelas, Peter)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE: Westfield Insurance Company was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Westfield Insurance Company shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/2/2020 (kdw)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Westfield Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-388-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/22/2020 (kdw)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G. Syregelas on behalf of Westfield Insurance Company (Syregelas, Peter)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Charles Hall, Pepsi Midamerica Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4170005.), filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Syregelas, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Company v. Pepsi Midamerica Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter G. Syregelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsi Midamerica Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?