Hazlitt et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Yolanda Brown, John Doe, Roslyn Hazlitt and Richard Robinson
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00421
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #19 ) on or before July 27, 2020. Responses due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/23/2020. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 22, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Yolanda Brown, Jane Doe, John Doe, Roslyn Hazlitt, Richard Robinson. (Schlichter, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Eric M. Roberts)(Shah, Raj)
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 7/16/2020 (Shah, Raj)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-421-NJR. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Shah, Raj)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Schlichter, Andrew)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ALLOWS Apple Inc. up to and including June 13, 2020 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/12/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.. (Shah, Raj)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Apple Inc.. (Shah, Raj)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian G. Montroy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Montroy, Christian)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander L. Braitberg on behalf of Yolanda Brown, Jane Doe, John Doe, Roslyn Hazlitt, Richard Robinson (Braitberg, Alexander)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett C. Rismiller on behalf of Yolanda Brown, Jane Doe, John Doe, Roslyn Hazlitt, Richard Robinson (Rismiller, Brett)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Schlichter on behalf of Yolanda Brown, Jane Doe, John Doe, Roslyn Hazlitt, Richard Robinson (Schlichter, Andrew)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome J. Schlichter on behalf of Yolanda Brown, Jane Doe, John Doe, Roslyn Hazlitt, Richard Robinson (Schlichter, Jerome)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amanda C. Fitzsimmons on behalf of Apple Inc.; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord on behalf of Apple Inc..(trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4175917 by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Ord, Isabelle)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amanda C. Fitzsimmons $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4175749 by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Fitzsimmons, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Apple Inc., Yolanda Brown, Jane Doe, John Doe, Roslyn Hazlitt, Richard Robinson. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-421-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/28/2020 (trb)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Roberts on behalf of Apple Inc. (Roberts, Eric)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Raj N. Shah on behalf of Apple Inc. (Shah, Raj)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit St. Clair County, case number 20 L 0206 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4174764), filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shah, Raj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazlitt et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Brett C. Rismiller
Represented By: Jerome J. Schlichter
Represented By: Andrew D. Schlichter
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Represented By: Alexander L. Braitberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Brown
Represented By: Brett C. Rismiller
Represented By: Jerome J. Schlichter
Represented By: Andrew D. Schlichter
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Represented By: Alexander L. Braitberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Brett C. Rismiller
Represented By: Jerome J. Schlichter
Represented By: Andrew D. Schlichter
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Represented By: Alexander L. Braitberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn Hazlitt
Represented By: Brett C. Rismiller
Represented By: Jerome J. Schlichter
Represented By: Andrew D. Schlichter
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Represented By: Alexander L. Braitberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Robinson
Represented By: Brett C. Rismiller
Represented By: Jerome J. Schlichter
Represented By: Andrew D. Schlichter
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Represented By: Alexander L. Braitberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Raj N. Shah
Represented By: Eric M. Roberts
Represented By: Amanda C. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Isabelle Louise Ord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?