Harrison v. Pritzker
Plaintiff: Sonja Harrison and Sonja Harrison doing business as Visible Changes
Defendant: Governor JB Pritzker and Jay Robert Pritzker
Case Number: 3:2020cv00438
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Approved by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 6/11/2020. (jlm)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: A Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 16) was filed by Sonja Harrison on June 10, 2020. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), a plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Defendant has not filed an answer or motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal appears proper under 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Court therefore accepts Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 16) and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to DISMISS this cause WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 6/11/2020. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sonja Harrison (Wallace, Steven)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-438-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wallace, Steven) Modified on 6/4/2020 (kdw).
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE: Sonja Harrison was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Sonja Harrison shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/10/2020 (kdw)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/3/2020. (kll)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Wallace on behalf of Sonja Harrison (Wallace, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jay Robert Pritzker. (Rees, R.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jay Robert Pritzker. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (Rees, R.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Rees, R.)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Verticchio on behalf of Jay Robert Pritzker (Verticchio, Thomas)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Letter. Filed in incorrect case. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN Letter sent to Attorney Thomas G. DeVore regarding Attorney Admissions (ack) Modified on 5/12/2020 (ack).
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Letter sent to Attorney DeVore and Hyam regarding Attorney Admissions. (kdw)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: JB Pritzker. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-438-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 6/2/2020 (kdw)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Douglas Rees on behalf of JB Pritzker (Rees, R.)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the Fourth Judicial Circuit, Clay County, case number 2020 CH 8 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4177911), filed by JB Pritzker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Brief, #3 Exhibit Civil cover sheet)(Rees, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Harrison doing business as Visible Changes
Represented By: Erik Daniel Hyam
Represented By: Thomas G. DeVore
Represented By: Steven M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor JB Pritzker
Represented By: R. Douglas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Robert Pritzker
Represented By: R. Douglas Rees
Represented By: Thomas J. Verticchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?