Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Zoie LLC
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois and Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: Zoie LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00461
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #11 Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kimmey, James)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Zoie LLC. (amv)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kimmey, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Zoie LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Kimmey, James)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Return of Service Executed filed by Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil&Service of Process& Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY STRICKEN: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs on 06/16/2020. (Kimmey, James) Modified on 6/23/2020 (trb).
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Zoie LLC and original mailed to Attorney Kimmey. (kdw)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Kimmey, James)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kimmey, James)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-461-GCS. Consent due by 6/8/2020 (trb)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4182981.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Kimmey, James)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Kimmey, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kimmey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Zoie LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoie LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?