Green v. Meeks et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Green
Defendant: Erin Mears-Attig, Rashida Pollion, Steven Meeks, Mary Zimmer, B White, John Shepherd, Vipin Shah, Unknown Wexford Doctor, Gail Walls, Mohammed Siddiqui, Kim Hugo, Wexford Health Source's Inc., Barbara Winter and Michael Moldenhauer
Case Number: 3:2020cv00463
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Agreed) by Victoria Green. (Hazinski, John)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying #84 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Kim Hugo. Plaintiff Green has filed an unopposed motion asking the Court to dismiss all claims against Defendant Kim Hugo without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Rule 41 allows for voluntary dismissals under certain circumstances, but the rule is circumscribed to dismissals of "actions," not "parties" or "claims," meaning that the rule cannot be used to get rid of one claim or one party from a larger case. See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F.3d 851, 857-58 (7th Cir. 2015); Musa v. Kabul, Inc., 15-cv-804, 2016 WL 4734743, at *1 (W.D. Wisc. Sept. 9, 2016). To dismiss one claim or individual parties from a case that otherwise will continue, a plaintiff instead must file an amended complaint, which she can do as of right in some circumstances and on motion in others. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15. Here, Defendants have either filed responsive pleadings or motions to dismiss, so Plaintiff Green would need to seek leave to file an amended complaint that did not include Kim Hugo as a party. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/13/2020. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint by Steven Meeks.(Tolbert, Carla)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kim Hugo (Agreed) by Victoria Green. Responses due by 8/10/2020 (Grady, Sarah)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Victoria Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of RFPs to All Defendants, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Individual Defendants, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Wexford, #5 Exhibit Defendants' Issued Subpoenas - Redacted)(Hazinski, John)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/5/2020 at 2:00 PM with Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1831; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 9139610; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 9342. The parties are to submit by email to NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov a Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven (7) days prior to the conference call. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/6/2020. (drb)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer filed by Defendant Meeks due July 13, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/2/2020. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 filed by Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Wexford Health Source's Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer. (Wallis, Ryan)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kim Hugo. Responses due by 8/3/2020 (Tolbert, Carla)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint by Erin Mears-Attig, Gail Walls.(Tolbert, Carla)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Steven Meeks. (Tolbert, Carla)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #75 Status Report filed by Victoria Green. The Joint Report of Parties attached at Doc. 75 is to be emailed to the appropriate Judge and not filed on the docket. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STRICKEN. STATUS REPORT (Joint Report of Parties Regarding Scheduling Order) by Victoria Green. (Grady, Sarah) Modified on 6/26/2020 (kls3).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel D. Schwarzlose on behalf of Erin Mears-Attig (Schwarzlose, Rachel)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla G. Tolbert on behalf of Erin Mears-Attig (Tolbert, Carla)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Loevy on behalf of Victoria Green (Loevy, Arthur)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon I. Loevy on behalf of Victoria Green (Loevy, Jon)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kanovitz on behalf of Victoria Green (Kanovitz, Michael)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 filed by Victoria Green. (Hazinski, John)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Hazinski on behalf of Victoria Green (Hazinski, John)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer to the Second Amended Complaint due June 29, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/2/2020. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kim Hugo, Steven Meeks, Gail Walls. (Tolbert, Carla)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel D. Schwarzlose on behalf of Kim Hugo, Steven Meeks, Gail Walls (Schwarzlose, Rachel)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla G. Tolbert on behalf of Kim Hugo, Steven Meeks, Gail Walls (Tolbert, Carla)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is requested that Attorneys Matthew Howard Weller and Joseph Lombardo be granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Mohammed Siddiqui, John Shepherd, Vipin Shah, Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Mary Jo Zimmer, and Barbara Winter. The Motion is GRANTED. Defendants will continue to be represented by Attorneys Timothy Dugan and Ryan Wallis. Attorneys Matthew Howard Weller and Joseph Lombardo terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/22/2020. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Withdraw by Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Wexford Health Source's Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer. (Wallis, Ryan)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Wexford Health Source's Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer. (Wallis, Ryan)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C. Wallis on behalf of Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Wexford Health Source's Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer (Wallis, Ryan)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Dugan on behalf of Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Wexford Health Source's Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer (Dugan, Timothy)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Letter to Attorneys Arthur Loevy, John Hazinski, Jonathan Loevy, Michael Kanovitz, and Joseph Lombardo regarding admission to SDIL. (jsm2)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-463-NJR. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jsm2)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07089. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Illinois the electronic record. (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/15/2020. Mailed notice(mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated, Defendants' motion to transfer, R. #43 , is granted, and the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Southern District of Illinois forthwith Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/15/2020. Mailed notice(mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY by Defendants Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer In Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Dr. Meeks)(Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket7, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE by Victoria Greenin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Kim Hugo, Erin Mears-Attig, Steven Meeks, Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Gail Walls, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer to transfer case #43 (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Exhibit List), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Hazinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants' motion to dismiss #42 is entered and continued generally. Motion hearing held on 2/19/2020. Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to transfer case #43 is due due by 3/12/2020. Defendants' reply is due by 3/26/2020. Status hearing set for 4/8/2020 at 09:00 AM. The filing of a responsive pleading is stayed. Mailed notice (srn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kim Hugo by James Patrick Doran (Doran, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Victoria Green. Kim Hugo waiver sent on 1/16/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Jack Lombardo for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #42 , motion to transfer case,, #43 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/19/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Defendants Kim Hugo, Erin Mears-Attig, Steven Meeks, Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Gail Walls, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer to transfer case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Siddiqui, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Shepherd, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Moldenhauer, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Shah, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Pollion, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Zimmer, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Winter)(Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Barbara Winter, Mary Zimmer Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Counts IV-VI of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Barbara Winter by Joseph Jack Lombardo (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Barbara Winter by Matthew H Weller (Weller, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Second AMENDED complaint by Victoria Green against All Defendants (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to 3/12/2020 to serve defendants Hugo and Winter #32 is granted. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file second amended complaint #34 is granted. The 2/10/2020 status hearing is vacated and reset for 4/9/2020 at 09:00 AM. A joint status report is to be filed by 4/6/2020. No appearance is required on 1/27/2020. Mailed notice (srn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc. by Joseph Jack Lombardo (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc. by Matthew H Weller (Weller, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by John Thomas Hazinski for presentment of motion for leave to file #34 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Hazinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff Victoria Green for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Hazinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by John Thomas Hazinski for presentment of extension of time #32 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Hazinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Victoria Green for extension of time to complete service (Hazinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Victoria Green. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rashida Pollion by Joseph Jack Lombardo (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rashida Pollion by Matthew H Weller (Weller, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROTECTIVE Order: Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/17/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for protective order #25 is granted. Counsel is directed to submit a proposed order to Judge Durkin's proposed order e-filing in-box. No appearance is required on 1/21/2020.Mailed notice (srn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Copeland Grady for presentment of motion for protective order #25 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Victoria Green for protective order Unopposed (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Steven Meeks, Gail Walls by James Patrick Doran (Doran, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Joint status report due by 2/5/2020. Status hearing set for 2/10/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/13/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants Suddiqui, Shepherd, Shah, Moldenhauer, and Zimmer's unopposed motion for extension of time to 1/31/2020 to answer or otherwise plead #20 is granted. No appearance is required on 1/21/2020. Mailed notice (srn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Jack Lombardo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #20 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Michael Moldenhauer, Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui, Mary Zimmer for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui by Joseph Jack Lombardo (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui by Matthew H Weller (Weller, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Moldenhauer, Mary Zimmer by Joseph Jack Lombardo (Lombardo, Joseph) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael Moldenhauer, Mary Zimmer by Matthew H Weller (Weller, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to John Shepherd on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED complaint by Victoria Green against All Defendants (Hazinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Victoria Green. Steven Meeks waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Gaill Walls by Victoria Green (Envelope postmarked 11/27/2019). (mc, ) . [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Victoria Green. Gail Walls waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Grady, Sarah) Modified on 12/3/2019 (smm, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to Michael Moldenhauer on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to Erin Mears-Attig on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Mary Zimmer on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Mohammed Siddiqui on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Grady, Sarah) Modified on 11/26/2019 (pj, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Green as to Rashida Pollion on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019; Vipin Shah on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by John Thomas Hazinski (Hazinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Kim Hugo. (txl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Vipin Shah, John Shepherd, Mohammed Siddiqui (Lam, Tina) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kim Hugo, Erin Mears-Attig, Michael Moldenhauer, Rashida Pollion, Mary Zimmer (Lam, Tina) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Stephen H. Weil (Weil, Stephen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Victoria Green by Sarah Copeland Grady (Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Victoria Green; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16382371. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grady, Sarah) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Meeks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Mears-Attig
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Represented By: Carla G. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashida Pollion
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Meeks
Represented By: James P. Doran
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Represented By: Carla G. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Zimmer
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shepherd
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipin Shah
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wexford Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Walls
Represented By: James P. Doran
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Represented By: Carla G. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Siddiqui
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Hugo
Represented By: James P. Doran
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Represented By: Carla G. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Source's Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Winter
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moldenhauer
Represented By: Joseph J. Lombardo
Represented By: Matthew Howard Weller
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Ryan C. Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Green
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Represented By: John Thomas Hazinski
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Jon I. Loevy
Represented By: Michael Kanovitz
Represented By: Arthur Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?