Parker v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: beth parker
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC, Cooper Companies, Inc., Coopersurgical, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a division of Barr Pharmaceuticlas, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, Inc. and Teva Women's Health, Inc..
Case Number: 3:2020cv00494
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Booker T. Coleman, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Coleman, Booker)
July 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 25 Notice Requesting Consent. Notice was entered in error. A request for reassignment had been received and case had been reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, granting #24 MOTION for Extension of Time DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Responsive pleadings due 8/12/2020. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/21/2020. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2020 Filing 25 STRICKEN NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Cooper Companies Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womend's Health LLC, Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Teva Women's Health Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., Cooper Companies Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womend's Health LLC, Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Teva Women's Health Inc on 7/21/20. Consent due by 8/11/2020 (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 7/21/2020 (amv).
July 20, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Defendants. (Coleman, Booker)
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Booker T. Coleman, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Coleman, Booker)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, re: jurisdictional defect. Amended pleading due by 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/15/2020. (jdh)
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-494-JPG. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Jones, Robert)
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE: Beth Parker was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Beth Parker shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/29/2020 (lmb)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Cooper Companies, Inc., Coopersurgical, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc.., Teva Women's Health, LLC. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Requested. (Romani, Allyson)
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Requested. (Romani, Allyson)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Requested. (Romani, Allyson)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Requested. (Romani, Allyson)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Requested. (Romani, Allyson)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Requested. (Romani, Allyson)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson M. Romani on behalf of Beth Parker (Romani, Allyson)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entry modified to remove incorrect docket text "Signed by Unassigned". No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Attorney Robert Andrew Jones Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Attorney Lauren Sanderson Miller Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Stephen Ray Hunt, Jr Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen Ray Hunt, Jr $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4198331 by on behalf of Beth Parker. (Hunt, Stephen)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren Sanderson Miller $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4198324 by on behalf of Beth Parker. (Miller, Lauren)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Andrew Jones $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4198306 by on behalf of Beth Parker. (Jones, Robert)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 4 Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents. Please note, the summonses submitted are in fillable format. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. In addition, summonses should be completed in their entirety to include service information as to plaintiff's counsel. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1 Complaint, filed by Beth Parker. The summonses submitted are incomplete and in fillable format. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. Summonses are to be completed with defendants name and address with the listed Plaintiff's Attorney who it must be served. Filer is to refile corrected documents. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 5/29/2020 (kdw).
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, filed by Beth Parker. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Romani does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case.(kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Beth Parker. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-494-GCS. Consent due by 6/19/2020 (kdw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cooper Companies, Inc., Coopersurgical, Inc., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed by beth parker. Filing fee $400 receipt number 0754-4190691(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Romani, Allyson) Modified on 5/29/2020 (kdw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a division of Barr Pharmaceuticlas, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc..
Represented By: Booker T. Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: beth parker
Represented By: Allyson M. Romani
Represented By: Lauren Sanderson Miller
Represented By: Robert Andrew Jones
Represented By: Stephen Ray Hunt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?