USA v. One 2004 Phaeton RV, VIN:4UZAAHAK24CM37627 et al
Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: $14,790.00 in United States Currency, One 2004 Phaeton RV, VIN:4UZAAHAK24CM37627 and $11,910.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Jay Laes
Case Number: 3:2020cv00519
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Jay Laes to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Jay Laes on 7/16/2020. Consent due by 8/6/2020 (tba)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 CLAIM Ownership interest by All Defendants. (Koester, Jessica)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J. Koester on behalf of All Defendants (Koester, Jessica)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Warrant Issued In REM with respect to $11,910.00 in United States Currency (rah)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 Warrant Issued In REM with respect to $14,790.00 in United States Currency (rah)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 Warrant Issued In REM with respect to One 2004 Phaeton RV, VIN:4UZAAHAK24CM37627 (rah)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by USA re #1 Complaint, (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hanna, Adam)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #1 Complaint, filed by USA. Plaintiff was incorrectly listed as "United States". The Clerk's office modified the Plaintiff's name to "USA". No further action is required by the filer in relation to these deficiencies. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: United States. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-519-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 6/24/2020 (tba)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of United States (Hanna, Adam)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $11,910.00 in United States Currency, $14,790.00 in United States Currency, One 2004 Phaeton RV, VIN:4UZAAHAK24CM37627, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One 2004 Phaeton RV, VIN:4UZAAHAK24CM37627 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,790.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2004 Phaeton RV, VIN:4UZAAHAK24CM37627
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,910.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jay Laes
Represented By: Jessica J. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?