Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Litteken Electric
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust and Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee
Defendant: Litteken Electric
Case Number: 3:2020cv00529
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL: The record indicates Defendant Litteken Electric has been served, yet has failed to file an answer or otherwise plead in response to the complaint. Therefore, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that this case will be dismissed for want of prosecution unless Plaintiff moves for a clerk's entry of default under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) by August 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/21/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hansen, Amanda)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund,Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund were directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund,Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust, Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 7/7/2020 (tba)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Litteken Electric served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Hansen, Amanda)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Litteken Electric. Original mailed to Matthew B. Leppert. (tba)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-529-GCS. Consent due by 6/29/2020 (tba)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Leppert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leppert, Matthew)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Kristine Hansen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hansen, Amanda)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4196971.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Litteken Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Electrical Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 IBEW Income Security Fund
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Vacation Trust Fund
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 309 Wireman's Pension Trust
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southwestern Illinois Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litteken Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?