Bennett, et al v. City of Centreville, et al.
Plaintiff: Cornelius Bennett and Earlie Fuse
Defendant: Dennis Traiteur, Jr., Lamar Gentry, Marius Jackson, Curtis Sr. McCall, Township of Centreville, City of Centreville IL, Commonfields of Cahokia Public Water District, Curtis McCall, Marius "Mark&quot Jackson, Commonfields of Cahokia, Dennis Traiteur and City of Centreville
Case Number: 3:2020cv00530
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #26 Notice of Appearance filed by Commonfields of Cahokia. Document is filed as to Defendants Commonfields of Cahokia, Curtis McCall, and Dennis Traiteur; however, only defendant Commonfields of Cahokia was selected upon docketing. Docket text has been modified accordingly. For future reference, when filing a document on behalf of multiple parties, filer needs to select each individual party as to whom the filing relates. If further help is needed, please contact the Clerk's Office at (618) 439-7760. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 8/26/2020 (kek)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: In addition to their complaint (Doc. 1), Plaintiffs filed a motion for injunctive relief (Doc. 2). All Defendants are hereby ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 2) on or before August 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 7/28/2020. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Commonfields of Cahokia, Curtis McCall, and Dennis Traiteur to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Commonfields of Cahokia, Curtis McCall, and Dennis Traiteur on 07/27/2020. Consent due by 8/17/2020 (kdw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #20 Answer to Complaint filed by Dennis Traiteur, #19 Answer to Complaint filed by Curtis McCall. Documents are duplicative entries of document 18. No further action required by the filer. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Scoggins on behalf of Commonfields of Cahokia, Curtis McCall, and Dennis Traiteur (Scoggins, Mark) Modified on 7/28/2020 (kek).
July 27, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Mark Scoggins does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 27, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing City of Centreville and Marius "Mark" Jackson to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to City of Centreville and Marius "Mark" Jackson on 7/27/2020. Consent due by 8/17/2020 (tba)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by City of Centreville, Marius "Mark" Jackson.(Meinders, Blake)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake G. Meinders on behalf of Marius "Mark" Jackson (Meinders, Blake)
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake G. Meinders on behalf of City of Centreville (Meinders, Blake)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 STRICKEN ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Dennis Traiteur.(Scoggins, Mark) Modified on 7/27/2020 (kdw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 STRICKEN ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Curtis McCall.(Scoggins, Mark) Modified on 7/27/2020 (kdw).
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Defs McCall & Traiteur and by Commonfields of Cahokia.(Scoggins, Mark)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Nelson, Nicole)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. City of Centreville served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Commonfields of Cahokia served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; LaMar Gentry served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Marius "Mark" Jackson served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Curtis McCall served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020; Township of Centreville served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Returned Executed for Marius Jackson, #2 Summons Summons Return Executed for City of Centreville, #3 Summons Summons Return Executed for Curtis McCall, #4 Summons Summons Return Executed for Dennis Traiteur, #5 Summons Summons Return Executed for LaMar Gentry, #6 Summons Summons Return Executed for Township)(Nelson, Nicole)
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, Amended Exhibits C and D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit D)(Nelson, Nicole)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking Exhibits 4 and 5 in document #1 per filer's request. Exhibits are duplicates and were filed in error.,, filed by Earlie Fuse, Cornelius Bennett. See attached document for specifics (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, Amended Exhibit. (Nelson, Nicole)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to City of Centreville, Commonfields of Cahokia, LaMar Gentry, Marius "Mark" Jackson, Curtis McCall, Township of Centreville, and Dennis Traiteur. Summonses returned to Attorney Nelson for service. (kls3)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Amended Document, filed by Earlie Fuse, Cornelius Bennett. Document stricken per request of filer. Filer to re-file correctly. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denise Nelson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nelson, Nicole)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kalila J. Jackson on behalf of Plaintiffs Cornelius Bennett and Earlie Fuse. (kls3)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Cornelius Bennett, Earlie Fuse. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-530-MAB. Consent due by 6/29/2020 (kls3)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, attachment to Complaint. (Nelson, Nicole)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kalila Jelani Jackson $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4197301 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Jackson, Kalila)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 STRICKEN. AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint,, Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Group F Exhibit-Part 1, #2 Exhibit Amended Group Exhibit F--Part 2)(Nelson, Nicole) Modified on 6/8/2020 (kls3).
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons Township of Centreville, #2 Summons City of Centreville, #3 Summons Curtis McCall Sr., #4 Summons Dennis Traiteur, #5 Summons LaMar Gentry, #6 Summons Marius Jackson)(Nelson, Nicole)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Nicole)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Nicole)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4197058.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A--Part 1, #2 Exhibit Group A--Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4STRICKEN - Exhibit Exhibit C, #5STRICKEN - Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Group F--Part 1, #8 Exhibit Group F--Part 2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Group I, #12 Exhibit Group J, #13 Exhibit Group K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Nelson, Nicole) Modified on 6/11/2020 (cds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett, et al v. City of Centreville, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Bennett
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlie Fuse
Represented By: Nicole Denise Nelson
Represented By: Kalila Jelani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Traiteur, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marius Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Sr. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township of Centreville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Centreville IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonfields of Cahokia Public Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis McCall
Represented By: Mark C. Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marius "Mark&quot Jackson
Represented By: Blake G. Meinders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonfields of Cahokia
Represented By: Mark C. Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Traiteur
Represented By: Mark C. Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Centreville
Represented By: Blake G. Meinders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?