Ceres Consulting L.L.C. v. Robin International Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ceres Consulting, L.L.C. and Ceres Consulting L.L.C.
Defendant: Robin International Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00558
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Miller, Bobby)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. Robin International Transport, Inc. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Miller, Bobby)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Robin International Transport, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Miller. (kek)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Miller, Bobby)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robin International Transport, Inc.. Original mailed to Attorney Bobby R. Miller. (tba)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #5 Summons Requested. Other: submitted summons is a fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. No further action required. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Miller, Bobby)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Ceres Consulting, L.L.C.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-558-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/6/2020 (kdw)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. (Miller, Bobby)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby R. Miller, Jr on behalf of Ceres Consulting, L.L.C. (Miller, Bobby)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robin International Transport, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4202142.), filed by Ceres Consulting L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Bobby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceres Consulting L.L.C. v. Robin International Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin International Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceres Consulting, L.L.C.
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceres Consulting L.L.C.
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?