Ross v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Renada T Ross
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00612
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renada T Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Office of Regional Counsel 7/7/20)(Pavisian, James)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renada T Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Attorney General 7/9/20)(Pavisian, James)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renada T Ross. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 7/6/20)(Pavisian, James)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (cds)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Unsealed on 7/10/2020 (cds).
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney James Pavisian. (lmb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Pavisian, James)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Renada T Ross. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/29/2020. (jdh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Pavisian, James)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-612-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Pavisian on behalf of Renada T Ross (Pavisian, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Renada T Ross. (Pavisian, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Renada T Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pavisian, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renada T Ross
Represented By: James Pavisian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?