Lanter Distributing LLC v. Lazer Spot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lanter Distributing LLC
Defendant: Lazer Spot, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00619
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Lazer Spot, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Lazer Spot, Inc. on 8/21/2020. Consent due by 9/11/2020 (tba)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Lazer Spot, Inc. Lazer Spot, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 9/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/20/2020. (lmo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Bub on behalf of Lazer Spot, Inc. (Bub, David)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lazer Spot, Inc.. (Copeland, Brandon)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland on behalf of Lazer Spot, Inc. (Copeland, Brandon)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanter Distributing LLC. Lazer Spot, Inc. served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Rembusch, Jill)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lazer Spot, Inc and mail original to Attorney Rembusch. (kdw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Rembusch, Jill)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Lanter Distributing LLC was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Lanter Distributing LLC shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 7/27/2020 (tba)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Letter sent to Attorney Jill R. Rembusch regarding admission to Southern District of Ilinois. (tba)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill R. Rembusch on behalf of Lanter Distributing LLC (Rembusch, Jill)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Rembusch does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Lanter Distributing LLC. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-619-RJD. Consent due by 7/17/2020 (tba)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lazer Spot, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4213249.), filed by Lanter Distributing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trailer Interchange Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Rembusch, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanter Distributing LLC v. Lazer Spot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanter Distributing LLC
Represented By: Jill R. Rembusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazer Spot, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon B. Copeland
Represented By: David P. Bub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?