Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds v. M.D. Magary Construction Company et al
Plaintiff: Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds
Defendant: M.D. Magary Construction Company, HOLLY CRAWFORD and Holly C. Crawford
Case Number: 3:2020cv00661
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Holly C. Crawford, M.D. Magary Construction Company. (trb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to all defendants by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Kelly, Chet)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. M.D. Magary Construction Company served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Kelly, Chet)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. Holly C. Crawford served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Kelly, Chet)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Holly C. Crawford and to M.D. Magary Construction Company. Summonses returned to Attorney Kelly for service. (kls3)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kelly, Chet)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-661-MAB. Consent due by 7/29/2020 (kls3)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kelly on behalf of Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds (Kelly, Chet)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4221357.), filed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds v. M.D. Magary Construction Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Magary Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLY CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly C. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds
Represented By: Chet A Kelly
Represented By: Chet A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?