Merriweather v. Beane et al
Plaintiff: Tyrome Merriweather
Defendant: Hart Leasing, Inc., Matthew Don Beane and Matthew Beane
Case Number: 3:2020cv00673
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0673. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/31/2020. (dmw2)
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 1:30 PM and a Presumptive Trial Month set for October, 2021 both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/31/2020. (dmw2)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-673-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Drew, Terese) Modified as FINAL and unsealed on 8/25/2020 (kls3).
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: Matthew Beane and Hart Leasing, Inc. were directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Matthew Beane and Hart Leasing, Inc. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 8/31/2020 (kls3)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ALLOWS Defendant Beane up to and including September 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/6/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela S. McQuage on behalf of Matthew Beane, Hart Leasing, Inc. (McQuage, Angela)
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra A Wolters on behalf of Matthew Beane (Wolters, Kendra)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Matthew Beane. (Noeltner, Barry)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry S. Noeltner on behalf of Matthew Beane (Noeltner, Barry)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Matthew Beane and Hart Leasing, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Matthew Beane and Hart Leasing, Inc. on 7/31/2020. Consent due by 8/21/2020 (kls3)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Terese A. Drew on behalf of Matthew Beane, Hart Leasing, Inc. (Drew, Terese)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Matthew Beane, Hart Leasing, Inc..(Drew, Terese)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Cooksey, Kristina) Unsealed on 8/25/2020 (kls3).
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Matthew Beane served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Rich, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Hart Leasing, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Rich, Thomas)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Tyrome Merriweather. Attachment 4 Entry of Appearance was deleted from the entry at Doc. 1 and was refiled at Doc. 7. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Rich on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rich, Thomas)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Matthew Beane and to Hart Leasing, Inc. Summonses returned to Attorney Thomas C. Rich for service. (kls3)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Tyrome Merriweather. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-673-GCS. Consent due by 7/31/2020 (kls3)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Joseph Chappell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chappell, Aaron)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina D. Cooksey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cooksey, Kristina)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Rich on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rich, Michelle)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4223804.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to be issued - Defendant Hart Leasing, #3 Summons Summons to be issued - Defendant Matthew Beane, # 4 Entry of Appearance deleted refiled at doc. 7 - Thomas Rich)(Rich, Thomas) Modified on 7/10/2020 (dkd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merriweather v. Beane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hart Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Terese A. Drew
Represented By: Angela S. McQuage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Don Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Beane
Represented By: Terese A. Drew
Represented By: Angela S. McQuage
Represented By: Barry S. Noeltner
Represented By: Kendra A Wolters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrome Merriweather
Represented By: Thomas C. Rich
Represented By: Kristina D. Cooksey
Represented By: Michelle M. Rich
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?