Patterson v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Patterson
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc. and Life Insurance Company of North America doing business as CIGNA Group Insurance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00688
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER. Discovery due by 4/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/4/2021 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 8/16/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report)(tag)
August 11, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Merlin, Melissa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Honeywell International Inc.. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - STD Plan)(Merlin, Melissa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Brodzik, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 8/4/2021 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 8/16/2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, granting #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Honeywell International Inc., #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Answer due 8/11/2020. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/21/2020. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 17, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Honeywell International Inc.. (Merlin, Melissa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Brodzik, James)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-688-JPG. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc.. (Merlin, Melissa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Removal byHoneywell International Inc.. (Merlin, Melissa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa M. Merlin on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Merlin, Melissa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 Letter to Attorney Melissa Z. Baris regarding general admission to ILSD (rah)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Ryan, Daniel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Brodzik, James)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Brodzik, James)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #3 Exhibit filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. The Civil Cover Sheet is a fillable document. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Olszeski on behalf of Thomas Patterson (Olszeski, Adam)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Life Insurance Company of North America. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-688-GCS. Consent due by 8/5/2020. (rah)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Life Insurance Company of North America to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal (Brodzik, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by Life Insurance Company of North America. Civil Cover Sheet. (Brodzik, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Brodzik, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County, case number 20L558 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4227272), filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brodzik, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Patterson
Represented By: Adam J. Olszeski
Represented By: Matthew R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Z. Baris
Represented By: Melissa M. Merlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America doing business as CIGNA Group Insurance
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Daniel K. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?