Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan et al v. JLB Construction Enterprise, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund, Local 551 and Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan
Defendant: JLB Construction Enterprise, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00696
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc. 5 sent to attorney Matthew B. Leppert returned as "Returned to Sender. Unable to Forward." (kls3)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 551, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund on 08/10/2020., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund, Local 551, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund. JLB Construction Enterprise, Inc. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Leppert, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #11 Return of Service Executed, filed by Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund, Local 551, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil>Service of Process> Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 STRICKEN RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund, Local 551, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan on 08/10/2020. (Leppert, Matthew) Modified on 8/19/2020 (ack).
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie J. Teague on behalf of Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund, Local 551, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan (Teague, Natalie)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Leppert, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan, Local 551, Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund and Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund STRIKING PLEADING: The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("et al" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is August 6, 2020. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Leppert, Matthew) Modified on 7/21/2020 (ack).
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund, Local 551, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund, Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan (Leppert, Matthew)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JLB Construction Enterprise, Inc.. (cds)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Kristine Hansen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hansen, Amanda)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-696-GCS. Consent due by 8/6/2020 (ack)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Leppert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leppert, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4228962.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Leppert, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan et al v. JLB Construction Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 551 Compulsory Vacation Savings Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees for the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees for the Local #551 Apprentices Training Fund
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 551
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 551 Pension Plan
Represented By: Matthew B. Leppert
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Hansen
Represented By: Natalie J. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLB Construction Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?