Souvannasot v. Klein
Plaintiff: Niyom Souvannasot
Defendant: Michael R. Klein
Case Number: 3:2020cv00714
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: : Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6.3.3 as case 1:20-cv-04899, filed 08/20/2020. (amv) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Docket Annotation: Case was electronically transferred to Northern District of Illinois. (amv)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Plaintiff alleges that after he was involved in a car accident his insurer, Traveler Metlife, refused to pay for the repair of his car. Plaintiff asserts Traveler Metlife lied, asserting his deductible was $1,000.00 rather than $500.00. To the extent that a viable and timely claim exists, Plaintiff does not demonstrate that the Southern District of Illinois is the proper forum for its resolution. This case has no apparent connection to this judicial district. Plaintiff lives in Joliet, Illinois and his claim is presumably based on events that occurred there. Consequently, this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Resolution of Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis and his motion for counsel are left for the transferee court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/19/2020. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBIT by Niyom Souvannasot. Exhibit to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits)(trb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Pro Se Plaintiff (kls3)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Niyom Souvannasot. (kls3)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kls3)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Plaintiff Souvannasot (lmb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Plaintiff re filing fee (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP) (trb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Niyom Souvannasot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(trb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Niyom Souvannasot. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-714-RJD. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. Consent due by 8/12/2020 (trb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael R. Klein, filed by Niyom Souvannasot.(trb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dkd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souvannasot v. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niyom Souvannasot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?