Shelter Insurance v. Swann et al
Plaintiff: Shelter Insurance
Defendant: Donald L Swann and Tina Marie Swann
Case Number: 3:2020cv00717
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Donald L Swann served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (amv)
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Donald L Swann. Original mailed to counsel for plaintiff for service. (amv)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Requested. (Syregelas, Peter)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Supplement filed by Tina Marie Swann. This matter comes before the Court for case management. On September 8, 2020, defendant Tina Swann filed a reply brief (Doc. 16). Local Rule 7.1 (c) states in part: Reply briefs are not favored and should be filed only in exceptional circumstances. The party filing the reply brief shall state the exceptional circumstances. Here, the reply brief does not state the exceptional circumstances as to why a reply brief is needed. Further, the reply brief exceeds the page limitation set forth in Local Rule 7.1(d). Thus, the Court STRIKES the reply/supplement #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 9/9/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 STRICKEN - SUPPLEMENT by Tina Marie Swann. Supplement to #1 Complaint, . (Daniel, William) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cds).
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 14 Notice Upon Consent to Trial by Magistrate. Docket entry 14 was entered in error and hereby stricken from the record. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 STRICKEN - NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-717-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 8/31/2020 (cds).
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: Tina Marie Swann was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Tina Marie Swann shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/1/2020 (cds)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Supplement to Motion to Dismiss filed by Shelter Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Syregelas, Peter)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Tina Marie Swann to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Tina Marie Swann on 7/30/2020. Consent due by 8/20/2020 (tba)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #6 Motion to Supplement filed by Tina Marie Swann. Filer used incorrect event. The correct event used should have been Supplement. The docket entry has been fixed to show the correct event. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tina Marie Swann. (Daniel, William)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to Motion to Dismiss by Tina Marie Swann. (Daniel, William) Modified on 7/30/2020 (tba).
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tina Marie Swann. Responses due by 8/31/2020 (Daniel, William)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Daniel on behalf of Tina Marie Swann (Daniel, William)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Shelter Insurance. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-717-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 8/13/2020 (cds)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G. Syregelas on behalf of Shelter Insurance (Syregelas, Peter)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Donald L Swann, Tina Marie Swann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4234851.), filed by Shelter Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Syregelas, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelter Insurance v. Swann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Marie Swann
Represented By: William S. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelter Insurance
Represented By: Peter G. Syregelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?