Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael J. Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00722
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34625103222 (cds)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael J. Johnson. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/27/2020. (jdh)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-722-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J. Daley, Jr on behalf of Michael J. Johnson (Daley, Frederick)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael J. Johnson. (Daley, Frederick)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael J. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Johnson
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?