Shafran et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teresa Shafran and Jeffrey Shafran
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00741
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Eastern District of Arkansas as case 4:20-cv-01040, filed 08/26/2020. (rah)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas. (kdw)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas and MDL #2949 In Re: Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. (kdw)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 1) (Attachments: #1 Minute Order)(kek)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Relkin on behalf of Jeffrey Shafran, Teresa Shafran (Relkin, Ellen)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT by Jeffrey Shafran, Teresa Shafran. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Relkin, Ellen)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc., and returned to Attorney Relkin for service. (kls3)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: The login used and attorney signature do not match on the Civil Cover Sheet attached at Doc. 1. Filer will re-file documents. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Relken does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Jeffrey Shafran, Teresa Shafran. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-741-RJD. Consent due by 8/20/2020 (kls3)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4241349.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 STRICKEN--TO BE REFILED. Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Relkin, Ellen) Modified on 7/30/2020 (kls3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafran et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Shafran
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Shafran
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?