Stein v. Lancaster, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Tyra Stein
Defendant: Nikhil Bhatt and Hugh K. Lancaster, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00764
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Acknowledgement Letter received from Williamson County State Court. (trb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to Williamson County Circuit Court regarding Order Remanding Case (amv)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REMAND: Case remanded to Williamson County, IL. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/17/2020. (jdh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Remand by Tyra Stein. Responses due by 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Farroll, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-764-JPG. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hanna, Adam)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5), or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by Nikhil Bhatt, Hugh K. Lancaster, Jr.. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Michael T. Newman)(Hanna, Adam)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Party by Nikhil Bhatt, Hugh K. Lancaster, Jr.. (Hanna, Adam)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Nikhil Bhatt, Hugh K. Lancaster, Jr., Tyra Stein. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-764-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 8/28/2020 (kdw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of Nikhil Bhatt, Hugh K. Lancaster, Jr. (Hanna, Adam)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Judicial Circuit Court, Williamson County, Illinois, case number 20-L-66, filed by Nikhil Bhatt, Hugh K. Lancaster, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Certification of Scope of Employment, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Lancaster, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyra Stein
Represented By: Daniel W. Farroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikhil Bhatt
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh K. Lancaster, Jr.
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?