Gem City Fresh-Mex, Inc. et al v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: Gem City Fresh-Mex, Inc. d/b/a Qdoba, Gem City Custard, Inc. d/b/a Culvers, Gem City Custard, Inc. doing business as Culvers and Gem City Fresh-Mex, Inc. doing business as Qdoba
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00765
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marion Madelene Reilly. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marion Madelene Reilly $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4277442 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Reilly, Marion)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-765-SMY. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Underwood, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS - SPRINGFIELD filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hoerman, Tor)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Brennan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brennan, Kenneth)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Robert C. Hilliard. For future reference, all future documents filed in this case should contain case number 20-cv-765-GCS. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert C. Hilliard $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4255207 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hilliard, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting, over any objection Plaintiffs may have, #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court EXTENDS Defendants time to file an answer or other pleading responsive to Plaintiffs Complaint to after resolution of Defendants Motion to Transfer to the Central District of Illinois Springfield. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/14/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS - SPRINGFIELD by Society Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Underwood, Thomas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Society Insurance. (Underwood, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Letters to Attorneys Jay A. Urban and Robert C. Hilliard regarding admission to ILSD (Attachments: #1 Letter) (rah)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Gem City Custard, Inc., Gem City Fresh-Mex, Inc., Society Insurance. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-765-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 8/28/2020. (rah)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Sanders on behalf of Society Insurance (Sanders, Michael)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Underwood on behalf of Society Insurance (Underwood, Thomas)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County, case number 2020L622 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4248287), filed by Society Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Underwood, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gem City Fresh-Mex, Inc. et al v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: Michael D. Sanders
Represented By: Thomas B. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gem City Fresh-Mex, Inc. d/b/a Qdoba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gem City Custard, Inc. d/b/a Culvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gem City Custard, Inc. doing business as Culvers
Represented By: Jay A. Urban
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Marion Madelene Reilly
Represented By: Tor A. Hoerman
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gem City Fresh-Mex, Inc. doing business as Qdoba
Represented By: Jay A. Urban
Represented By: Kenneth J. Brennan
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Marion Madelene Reilly
Represented By: Tor A. Hoerman
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?