Truelove et al v. United Van Lines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Truelove and Christina Hendrix
Defendant: Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., Rahshawn Jordan, UniGroup, C.A. and United Van Lines, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00791
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 33 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Fritz, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, Rule 12 Defenses and Affirmative Defenses by Rahshawn Jordan.(Fritz, Kevin)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted, enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 5258. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 10/9/2020.(lmt)
October 9, 2020 Filing 30 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Presumptive Jury Trial Month set for November 2021 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. (lmt)
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Truelove, Christina Hendrix. Rahshawn Jordan served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Truelove, Christina Hendrix. UniGroup, C.A. served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Truelove, Christina Hendrix. United Van Lines, LLC served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Truelove, Christina Hendrix. Planes Moving and Storage, Inc. served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 24 Notice Upon Consent to Trial by Magistrate. Notice entered in error. Document stricken.(trb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 24 ENTRY STRICKEN: NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-791-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 9/18/2020 (trb).
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 CONSENT/ NON CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Leizerman, Michael) (trb).
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Fritz, Kevin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A.and United Van Lines, LLC on 9/17/20. Consent due by 10/8/2020 (trb)
September 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #19 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("et al" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 ENTRY STRICKEN:CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Leizerman, Michael) Modified on 9/17/2020 (trb).
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E. Foppe on behalf of Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC (Foppe, Patrick)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC. (Fritz, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, by Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC.(Fritz, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Fritz on behalf of Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Reissued as to Rahshawn Jordan. Original mailed to Attorney Leizerman (lmb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Requested. (Leizerman, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Rahshawn Jordan, Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A., and United Van Lines, LLC. Originals returned to Attorney Leizerman for service.(kls3)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons United Van Lines, LLC, #3 Summons United Van Lines, LLC, #4 Summons UniGroup, C.A., #5 Summons UniGroup, C.A., #6 Summons Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., #7 Summons Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., #8 Summons Rahshawn Jordan)(Leizerman, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE: Christina Hendrix, Daniel Truelove was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Christina Hendrix, Daniel Truelove shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 9/16/2020 (trb)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Planes Moving and Storage, Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Van Lines, LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. UniGroup, C.A. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Leizerman, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JURISDICTIONAL ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte on the issue of federal subject matter jurisdiction. See Foster v. Hill, 497 F.3d 695, 696-97 (7th Cir. 2007) ("It is the responsibility of a court to make an independent evaluation of whether subject matter jurisdiction exists in every case."). Plaintiffs filed this action on August 17, 2020 based on the complete diversity of the parties (Doc. 1). However, the allegations regarding the citizenship of Defendant United Van Lines, LLC and Unigroup, C.A. are deficient. The citizenship of an LLC for diversity purposes is the citizenship of each of its members. See, e.g., Copeland v. Penske Logistics, LLC, 675 F.3d 1040, 1043 (7th Cir. 2012). The citizenship of an unincorporated entity is likewise the citizenship of each of its members. Americold Realty Tr. v. Conagra Foods, Inc., 136 S. Ct. 1012, 1015 (2016). Consequently, the jurisdictional statement for these two Defendants must identify the citizenship of each of its members as of the date the complaint was filed, and, if those members have members, the citizenship of those members as well, until a corporation or a natural person is reached. West v. Louisville Gas & Elec. Co., 951 F.3d 827, 829 (7th Cir. 2020); Thomas v. Guardsmark, LLC, 487 F.3d 531, 534 (7th Cir. 2007). Accordingly, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint by September 17, 2020 that clearly sets forth all of the information needed to determine whether the parties are completely diverse. If Plaintiffs fail to file an Amended Complaint in the manner and time prescribed or if, after reviewing it, the Court finds that Plaintiffs cannot establish complete diversity, the Court may dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/27/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Leizerman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leizerman, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Rahshawn Jordan, Planes Moving and Storage, Inc., UniGroup, C.A., and United Van Lines, LLC. Original summonses returned to Attorney Leizerman for service. (kls3)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Leizerman does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Christina Hendrix, Daniel Truelove. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-791-MAB. Consent due by 9/8/2020 (trb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4256189.), filed by Daniel Truelove, Christina Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Order Appointing Co-Special Representatives, #3 Summons United Van Lines, LLC, #4 Summons United Van Lines, LLC - Agent, #5 Summons UniGroup - Agent, #6 Summons UniGroup, C.A., #7 Summons Planes Moving and Storage, Inc, #8 Summons Planes Moving and Storage, Inc. - Agent, #9 Summons Jordan)(Leizerman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truelove et al v. United Van Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planes Moving and Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahshawn Jordan
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UniGroup, C.A.
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Van Lines, LLC
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Truelove
Represented By: Michael J. Leizerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Hendrix
Represented By: Michael J. Leizerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?