Johnson v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Clarence D Johnson, Jr
Defendant: Lance Watson, CIA, State Police, Dale Osheilds and US Judges
Case Number: 3:2020cv00792
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 Speedy MOTION for Trial by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for New Case Numbers by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 277, this case is transferred from Judge Staci M. Yandle and reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-792-SPM. (jaj)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for United Nations Ethics Committee by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Disbarment of Judges by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED and the Complaint (Doc. #2 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint on or before October 8, 2020. The Motion for Recruitment of Counsel (Doc. #4 ) and Motion for Service of Process at Government Expense (Doc. #5 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/8/2020. (dah)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge Staci M. Yandle. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jsm2)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: This case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-792-SMY. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (tba)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clarence D Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(tba)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Clarence D Johnson, Jr. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-792-RJD. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. Consent due by 9/8/2020 (tba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Osheilds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Judges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence D Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?