Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Defendant: EVANSVILLE WESTERN RAILWAY, INC. and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00795
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:1471
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Instructions to join the phone conference are as follows: Call toll free 1-888-684-8852, when prompted enter access code 6102338, when prompted enter the four-digit security code 9374. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/14/2020. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2020 Filing 78 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 277, this case is transferred from Judge J. Phil Gilbert and reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-795-SPM. (dkd)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joanna Maxwell. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joanna Maxwell $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4291582 by on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Maxwell, Joanna)
September 17, 2020 Filing 75 CJRA TRACK C assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 2/2/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag)
September 9, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-795-JPG. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2020 Filing 73 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Crowder, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J. Steif. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J. Steif $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4274788 by on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Steif, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 70 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Swartwout, Charles)
September 4, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison E. Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Allison)
September 4, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Swartwout on behalf of All Defendants (Swartwout, Charles)
August 31, 2020 Filing 67 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc 61 sent to Joanna Maxwell (lmb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 66 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc 60 sent to Attorney Joanna Maxwell (lmb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert S. Crowder. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 26, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert S. Crowder $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4265431 by on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Crowder, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen L. Wubker. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 21, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathleen L. Wubker $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4261574 by on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Wubker, Kathleen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 60 Letter to Attorneys of Record regarding registration and enrollment in our CM/ECF system. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (lmb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 59 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00079. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that Plaintiff's #49 Objections to the M&R are OVERRULED. Defendant's #27 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant EVWR's #30 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and, in the Alternative, For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is GRANTED with Modification. Defendant CSXT's #40 Motion to Change Venue is GRANTED. Plaintiff's #44 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. Accordingly this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/18/2020. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary Ellen Goode shall be removed as counsel of record for Defendants. The law firms McGuireWoods LLP and Abel Bean Law P.A. will continue to represent Defendants in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/29/20. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 56 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as Counsel of Record by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. Modified text and event on 5/29/2020 (mga). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joanna Maxwell, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. Replies due by 3/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Second Declaration of J. Thomas Garrett)(Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re #52 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Responses due by 3/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Consolidated Exhibits to Proposed Amended Complaint)(Lee, Scottie). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address by CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Objection to #48 Memorandum and Recommendations by CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 49 OBJECTION to #48 Memorandum and Recommendations by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Replies due by 2/4/2020 (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on #44 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, #30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Evansville Western Railway, Inc., #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CSX Transportation, Inc., #40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Notice of Consent to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1406 filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Objections to M&R due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/3/2020. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 47 Amended NOTICE of Change of Address by Scottie Forbes Lee (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scottie Forbes Lee (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Responses due by 7/29/2019 (Lee, Scottie). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Notice of Consent to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Notice of Consent to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Replies due by 7/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legislative History (H.R. Conf. Rep. No. 96-1430), #2 Exhibit Federal Judicial Caseload Statistics)(Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support re #40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Notice of Consent to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Denton)(Goode, Mary) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (brl). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Notice of Consent to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant, CSX Transportation, Inc.'s, Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two through Six by Evansville Western Railway, Inc. re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint, #37 Reply to Response to Motion, #28 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint, #30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Replies due by 5/28/2019 (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Replies due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Jay Smith, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - CSX breaks ground on Winter Haven terminal (Tampa Bay Bus. J.), #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Evansville Western Railway, Wikipedia, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 70 Fed. Reg. 52477, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Huge new rail hub opens in Winter Haven (Tampa Bay Bus. J.), #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 - EVWR on right track (Ind. Econ. Dig.), #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Intermodal (Site Selection Mag.), #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - CSX 2017 Annual Report Excerpts)(Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Replies due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Duygu Damar, Breaking the Liability Limits, 36 Tul. Mar. L.J. (law-review article cited in brief), #2 Exhibit Saul Sorkin, Goods in Transit (secondary source cited in brief))(Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint, #30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Responses due by 5/13/2019 Replies due by 5/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/17/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Briefing Deadlines for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [DKT 27, 30] by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Responses due by 5/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Scottie). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Joinder to Defendant, CSX Transportation, Inc.'s, Motion to Dismiss Claims For Relief Two Through Six by Evansville Western Railway, Inc. re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint, #28 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Thomas Garrett)(Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue, and In the Alternative, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Claims for Relief Two Through Six of Plaintiff's Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Klein Wubker on behalf of All Defendants (Wubker, Kathleen) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Evansville Western Railway, Inc. shall have up to and including April 11, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/22/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joshua Steif on behalf of All Defendants (Steif, Andrew) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Notice to Kathleen Klein Wubker: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/29/2019. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kathleen Klein Wubker is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. and Evansville Western Railway, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/22/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evansville Western Railway, Inc. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Little Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Evansville Western Railway, Inc. (Kitchin, Henry) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathleen K. Wubker Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3974757. by CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Goode on behalf of Evansville Western Railway, Inc. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Notice to Andrew J. Steif: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/22/2019. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Andrew J. Steif is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/15/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew J. Steif Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3968599. by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Little Kitchin, Jr on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Kitchin, Henry) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. shall have up to and including April 11, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/6/19. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Goode, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Goode on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Goode, Mary) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Notice to Joanna Maxwell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/7/2019. (eef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joanna Maxwell for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2019. (eef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Notice to Robert S. Crowder: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/7/2019. (eef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert S. Crowder for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2019. (eef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joanna Maxwell Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3941279. by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert S. Crowder Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3941273. by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Chamberlin on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Chamberlin, Andrew) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scottie Forbes Lee on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3941208), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waybills)(Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSVILLE WESTERN RAILWAY, INC.
Represented By: Henry Little Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen Klein Wubker
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Steif
Represented By: Mary Ellen Goode
Represented By: Charles J. Swartwout
Represented By: Allison E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Little Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen Klein Wubker
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Steif
Represented By: Mary Ellen Goode
Represented By: Charles J. Swartwout
Represented By: Kathleen L. Wubker
Represented By: Andrew J. Steif
Represented By: Allison E. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Represented By: Joanna Maxwell
Represented By: Andrew S. Chamberlin
Represented By: Scottie Forbes Lee
Represented By: Robert S. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?