Brand v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tauna Brand
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00806
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Gaines, Brent)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Gaines, Brent)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION re Exhibit 2 of #1 Complaint filed by Tauna Brand. Incorrect event selected. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Other Filings/ Other Documents". Filer should refile document using the correct event. Document has been deleted. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-806-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (ack)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent M. Gaines on behalf of Tauna Brand (Gaines, Brent)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tauna Brand. (Gaines, Brent)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tauna Brand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(Gaines, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tauna Brand
Represented By: Brent M. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?