Billhartz v. First Co Bancorp, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Billhartz
Defendant: First Co Bancorp, Inc., Ward Billhartz Trust, Mark Zavaglia and Ward Billhartz
Case Number: 3:2020cv00817
Filed: August 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Stephen P McGlynn
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 26 Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 277, this case is transferred from Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 3:20-cv-817-SPM. (kls3)
September 23, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marcia Billhartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Byron, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Marcia Billhartz. Responses due by 10/26/2020 (Byron, Christopher)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Counter-Defendant's deadline to file an answer or other response to the counterclaim is extended until seven days after the Court's ruling on Counter-Defendant's motion to remand. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/16/2020. (dhg)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: If Counter-Plaintiff wishes to file a response or otherwise object to #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Counter-Defendant Marcia Billhartz, such response is due on or before 9/16/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/15/2020. (dhg)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendants Ward Billhartz, Mark Zavaglia, and the Ward Billhartz Trust to file an answer or other response to the complaint in this action is EXTENDED to 10/23/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/15/2020. (dhg)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-817-NJR. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Byron, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lamping, Brian)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Marcia Billhartz. (Byron, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Marcia Billhartz. (Byron, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Marcia Billhartz. (Byron, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Responses due by 9/15/2020 (cds)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: If Plaintiff wishes to file a response or otherwise object to #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Ward Billhartz, Mark Zavaglia and #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Ward Billhartz Trust, such response is due on or before September 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/9/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Ward Billhartz, Mark Zavaglia, Ward Billhartz Trust to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Ward Billhartz, Mark Zavaglia, Ward Billhartz Trust on 9/9/2020. Consent due by 9/30/2020 (cds)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ward Billhartz Trust. (Nester, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nester on behalf of Ward Billhartz Trust (Nester, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ward Billhartz, Mark Zavaglia. (Nester, Daniel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Nester on behalf of Ward Billhartz, Mark Zavaglia (Nester, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Marcia Billhartz by First Co Bancorp, Inc..(Lamping, Brian)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Lamping on behalf of First Co Bancorp, Inc. (Lamping, Brian)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Lamping does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: First Co Bancorp, Inc.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-817-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 9/14/2020 (cds)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence C. Friedman on behalf of First Co Bancorp, Inc. (Friedman, Lawrence)
August 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by First Co Bancorp, Inc. Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action (Lamping, Brian)
August 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Co Bancorp, Inc.. (Lamping, Brian)
August 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois, case number 2020L 001146 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4261708), filed by First Co Bancorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamping, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billhartz v. First Co Bancorp, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Co Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence C. Friedman
Represented By: Brian A. Lamping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Billhartz Trust
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zavaglia
Represented By: Daniel C. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Billhartz
Represented By: Daniel C. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Billhartz
Represented By: Christopher J. Petri
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?