Brown v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sean Brown
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00833
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 47 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-833-NJR. (jlrr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 46 Letter to Attorneys of Record regarding admission to ILSD (rah)
August 28, 2020 Filing 45 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:19-cv-17167. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for Southern District of Illinois ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/27/2020. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #43 First MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois . Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 43 First MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois by SEAN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Laura G. Lumaghi, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, PETER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting letter request to extend the deadline to 7/17/2020 to file a Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/6/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting letter request to extend the deadline for filing a Motion to Transfer Venue to 7/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/9/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/29/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER On or before June 12, 2020, counsel shall file their Joint Motion for Transfer of Venue to the Southern District of Illinois. All deadlines are hereby STAYED pending the filing of the Motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/29/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER The Court hereby modifies the TIME ONLY of the April 29, 2020 telephone status conference previously set for 2:00 p.m. The NEW TIME of the telephone status conference is 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/21/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/27/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for April 29, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/27/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for March 27, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/25/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/25/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WILLIAM T. DOWD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William T. Dowd to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10363567.) (D'ARCY, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Douglas P. Dowd to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10362206.) (D'ARCY, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Laura G. Lumaghi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10362167.) (D'ARCY, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William T. Dowd to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10362045.) (D'ARCY, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DOUGLAS P. DOWD and LAURA G. LUMAGHI, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
February 4, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notices for Douglas p. Dowd #33 and #35 submitted by Andrew Darcy on 2/4/2020 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/22/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER The Court hereby reschedules the telephone status conference previously set for February 18, 2020 to February 25, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/22/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas P. Dowd, Esquire, William T. Dowd, Esquire, and Laura G. Lumaghi, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/22/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated January 22, 2020 from Laura Lumaghi, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to schedule a telephone status conference, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The telephone status conference is scheduled for January 22, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/22/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as ti Douglas P. Dowd, William T. Dowd, and Laura G. Lumaghi: $ 450, receipt number TRE109109 (mg) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 29 Letter from Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza re #26 Scheduling Order,. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher T. La Testa, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/10/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen E. Marshall, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/10/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/25/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Based on information in the Joint Discovery Plan and as set forth on the record, the Court hereby GRANTS defendant's request to conduct phased discovery limited to the issue of statute of limitations. Initial Scheduling Order to issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/25/19. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In=Person Initial Conference held on 11/25/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (dmr) (Main Document 24 replaced on 11/25/2019) (nar). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated November 20, 2019 from Peter W. Smith, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to permit plaintiff's co-counsel, William Dowd, Esquire and Laura Lumaghi, Esquire, to appear by telephone for the in-person Initial Conference, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/21/19. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Peter W. Smith, Esq.. (SMITH, PETER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC..(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., filed by SEAN BROWN.(SMITH, PETER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motions (Dkt. Nos. #14 , #15 ) shall file an amended certified statement of each applicant "disclosing each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing including the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar" as set forth in the amendment to L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1) (eff. March 1, 2010) (emphasis added); or in lieu thereof, may attach a certificate of good standing. See www.njd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/24/2019. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas P. Dowd, William T. Dowd, and Laura G. Lumaghi. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas P. Dowd, William T. Dowd, and Laura G. Lumaghi by SEAN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Peter W. Smith, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of D. Dowd, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of W. Dowd, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of L. Lumaghi, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, PETER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza in Support, #2 Certification of Stephen E. Marshall in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gianna Cricco-Lizza in Support, #2 Certification of Christopher La Testa in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated September 30, 2019 from Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza, Esquire, counsel for defendant, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for October 24, 2019, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is November 25, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 2040- Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/1/19. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Gianna E. Cricco-Lizza, Esq.. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon pre-motion letters, filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. [Dkt. No. 9] and Plaintiff Sean Brown [Dkt. No. 10], regarding Defendants proposed motion to dismiss Counts III, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and X from Plaintiffs Complaint. In response to Defendants proposed motion, Plaintiff has requested permission to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be permitted thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint. If, after the amended complaint is filed, Defendant still wishes to file a motion to dismiss, it should once again follow the procedures set forth in this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/26/2019. (Costigan, Roberta) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Andrew D'Arcy re #9 Letter. (SMITH, PETER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon a Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 4], filed by Defendant Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on September 17, 2019. The Court notes that Defendant has failed to comply with Section I.A of this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures, which states that In an effort to resolve cases expeditiously, before bringing a motion to dismiss a party must submit a letter, as described therein. Therefore, this Motion [Dkt. No. 4] is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. If Defendant seeks to bring its motion, it should first comply with this Courts Individual Rules. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/18/2019. (Costigan, Roberta) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 10/24/2019 03:00 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/18/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC..(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. identifying Abbott Laboratories as Corporate Parent.. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
August 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Peter W. Smith on 8/23/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account (under the "Utilities" tab in CM/ECF). (ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916666) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SEAN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, PETER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Brown
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Peter W. Smith
Represented By: William T. Dowd
Represented By: Laura G. Lumaghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Wendy L. Bloom
Represented By: Gianna Elissa Cricco-Lizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?