Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company v. Pap-R Products Company et al
Plaintiff: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: K. Scott Ware, studio503, LLC, Pap-R-Tainer LLC, The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC and Pap-R Products Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00874
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Studio 503 per Stipulation by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation)(Valentino, Richard)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-874-SMY. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #11 Notice (Other) filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Incorrect event used. The correct event is Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents/Consent Non Consent to Trial by Magistrate Judge. Entry has been sealed. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company re Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Valentino, Richard)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer LLC, The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC, K. Scott Ware, studio503, LLC. Original mailed to Attorney Richard T. Valentino. (ack)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-874-MAB. Consent due by 9/21/2020 (amv)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Valentino, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Valentino, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Valentino, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Valentino, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Valentino, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (Valentino, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T. Valentino on behalf of Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company (Valentino, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4269129.), filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R Part 1, #19 Exhibit R Part 2, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(Valentino, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company v. Pap-R Products Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard T. Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Scott Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: studio503, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pap-R-Tainer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pap-R Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?