Roberson et al v. Maestro Consulting Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Saroya Roberson, Jameea Boykin, Alyssa Bendersky, Tonika Smith, Olabisi Bodunde, Attla Dupree, Victoria Brewer, Idella Hill, Christa Hammond, Daphne Williams and Felecia Williams
Defendant: Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, John Doe, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Monroe Corp., Symphony HMG, LLC, California Gardens Corp., Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC and Maestro Consulting Services LLC individually and doing business as Symphony Post Acute Network
Case Number: 3:2020cv00895
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand filed by California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC. (Donado, Joseph)
October 29, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by C. John Baricevic on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baricevic, C.)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #45 is GRANTED. Defendants reply in support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is now due on or before 11/5/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/28/2020. (drr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 27, 2020 Filing 45 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC. (Donado, Joseph)
October 23, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan D. Hatch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hatch, Ethan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 43 SUPPLEMENT by All Plaintiffs. Supplement to #23 Motion to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Driscoll, John)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/23/2020.(drr) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 22, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Driscoll, John)
October 22, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: This case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-895-NJR. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 22, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #31 Notice Requesting Consent. Amended Entry on Appearance on file. No further action required at this time. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 21, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Driscoll, John)
October 21, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Byron on behalf of All Defendants (Byron, Christopher)
October 21, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Kalb on behalf of All Defendants (Kalb, Brian)
October 21, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Aurelio Donado on behalf of California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC (Donado, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. McArdle on behalf of California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC (McArdle, Richard)
October 16, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donado, Joseph)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' reply in support of #20 MOTION to Transfer Case is now due on or before 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 10/14/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 14, 2020 Filing 31 STRICKEN-NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing John Doe 1-100 to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to John Doe 1-100 on 10/14/2020. Consent due by 11/4/2020 (jlrr) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jlrr).
October 14, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #26 Notice of Appearance. Signature on document and login credentials used do not match. Notice has been properly filed at Document #29 and thus no further action is necessary. Document #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is duplicative of the Motion filed at Document #27 other than a proposed order attached. Since proposed orders are not to be filed, rather should be submitted via email to the assigned Judge, this motion is stricken from the docket and the motion filed at Document #27 will stand. No further action is required as to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 13, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Byron on behalf of All Defendants (Byron, Christopher)
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 STRICKEN - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Kalb, Brian) Modified on 10/14/2020 (kek).
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief by All Defendants. (Kalb, Brian)
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Kalb on behalf of All Defendants (Kalb, Brian) Modified on 10/14/2020 (kek).
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Kalb on behalf of All Defendants (Kalb, Brian)
October 7, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Driscoll, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Johnson, Paul)
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W. Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Paul)
September 24, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Donado, Joseph)
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donado, Joseph)
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Norton with Exhibits)(Donado, Joseph)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by California Gardens Corp., Maestro Consulting Services LLC, Monroe Corp., Symcare HMG, LLC, Symphony Beverly, LLC, Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC, Symphony Countryside, LLC, Symphony Crestwood, LLC, Symphony Deerbrook, LLC, Symphony HMG, LLC, Symphony Healthcare LLC, Symphony Jackson Square, LLC, Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC, Symphony M.L. LLC, Symphony Midway, LLC, Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC, Symphony Park South, LLC, Symphony South Shore, LLC, Symphony Sycamore LLC, Symphony of California Gardens, LLC, Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2020 (Donado, Joseph)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Driscoll, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #15 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. It fails to list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction ("et al" is insufficient). Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Another form is attached to this Notice. The form should be re-filed as soon as possible. The form should specifically list each party that is consenting or not consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 9/24/2020. (tba)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Driscoll, John) Modified on 9/17/2020 (tba).
September 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Aurelio Donado. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Aurelio Donado $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4278185 by on behalf of All Defendants. (Donado, Joseph)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before September 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/4/20. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-895-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 9/24/2020. (rah)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, case number 2017-L-00733 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4272172), filed by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBIT by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. Exhibit Q - Parts 21-26. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. Exhibit Q - Parts 6-20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Errata, #14 Exhibit)(McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. (McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. McArdle on behalf of Maestro Consulting Services LLC (McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. Exhibit Q - Part 5. (McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. Exhibit Q - Part 4. (McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. Exhibit Q - Part 3. (McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. Exhibit Q - Part 2. (McArdle, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 EXHIBIT by Maestro Consulting Services LLC. Exhibit Q - Part 1. (McArdle, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson et al v. Maestro Consulting Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saroya Roberson
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jameea Boykin
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Bendersky
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonika Smith
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olabisi Bodunde
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attla Dupree
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Brewer
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idella Hill
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Hammond
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Williams
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felecia Williams
Represented By: C. John Baricevic
Represented By: Paul W. Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ethan D. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maestro Consulting Services LLC
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Crestwood, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Sycamore LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Lincoln Park, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Corp.
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony HMG, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Gardens Corp.
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony of California Gardens, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony M.L. LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Countryside, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symcare HMG, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Deerbrook, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Jackson Square, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Beverly, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony of Evanston Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Midway, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony South Shore, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Bronzeville Park, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Park South, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphony Monarch Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maestro Consulting Services LLC individually and doing business as Symphony Post Acute Network
Represented By: Richard P. McArdle
Represented By: Brian R. Kalb
Represented By: Joseph Aurelio Donado
Represented By: Christopher W. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?