Kalous v. Prairie State Generating Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: angela Kalous
Defendant: Helen Gallagher and Prairie State Generating Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00899
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 01:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0899.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 10/5/2020. (cds)
October 5, 2020 Filing 18 CJRA TRACK B assigned:Presumptive Trial Month is November, 2021, Final Pretrial Conference set October 21, 2021 at 1:30pm both in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 10/5/2020. (cds)
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-899-GCS. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Barth, Brandy) Modified on 9/29/2020 (tba).
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE: Angela Kalous was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Angela Kalous shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 10/5/2020 (tba)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #13 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge. NOTICE to Angela Kalous STRIKING PLEADING: The Clerks Office received your Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form. The form is incomplete. Your attorney's signature was absent from the form. Therefore, the pleading is STRICKEN. Please refile the completed document. Another form is attached to this notice. Please note that, pursuant to the Courts prior Order, the deadline for submitting this form is 9/25/2020. (tba)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 STRICKEN CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Barth, Brandy) Modified on 9/28/2020 (tba).
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #11 Notice (Other) filed by Prairie State Generating Company, LLC, Helen Gallagher. Filer used the incorrect event when docketing CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE form. For future reference when docketing a consent/non-consent form, go to Civil > Other Documents > Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge. The docket entry has been corrected to show the correct event. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Taylor, Morgan) Modified on 9/25/2020 (tba).
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages by Helen Gallagher. (Martone, Andrew)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages by Prairie State Generating Company, LLC. (Martone, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prairie State Generating Company, LLC. (Martone, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #3 Notice (Other) filed by Prairie State Generating Company, LLC, Helen Gallagher, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Prairie State Generating Company, LLC, Helen Gallagher. The documents attached contains a Notice of Filing. Notices of Filing and Certificates of Service should only be filed as the final page of a pleading, and not a standalone document. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-899-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 9/25/2020 (tba)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Lee Taylor on behalf of All Defendants (Taylor, Morgan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by All Defendants of Notice of Removal Filed with Circuit Clerk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Circuit Clerk)(Martone, Andrew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Defendants to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att 1 - Notice of Removal and Exhibits)(Martone, Andrew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Martone on behalf of All Defendants (Martone, Andrew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court St Clair County, case number 20L0538 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4273294), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Martone, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalous v. Prairie State Generating Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: angela Kalous
Represented By: Brandy B. Barth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Gallagher
Represented By: Morgan Lee Taylor
Represented By: Andrew J. Martone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie State Generating Company, LLC
Represented By: Morgan Lee Taylor
Represented By: Andrew J. Martone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?