Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Riley Davis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: ssa ogc and SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00907
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file his answer and the administrative record on or before January 19, 2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/4/2020. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified Administrative Record (Unopposed) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schwartz, Alison)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Schwartz on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Schwartz, Alison)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Riley Davis. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (cds)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (cds)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Riley Davis. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/10/2020. (jdh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-907-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (cds)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Riley Davis. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Eaglin on behalf of Michael Riley Davis (Eaglin, Paul)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael Riley Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Eaglin, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Represented By: Alison Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Riley Davis
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ssa ogc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?