Madsen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: KENNETH MADSEN
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00981
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE Transfer case received by Eastern District of Missouri and assigned case number 4:20-cv-01449-ACL(amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 7, 2020 Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri (rah)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/6/2020. (cab).
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #9 Summons Issued as to USA. Summons issued in error. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Madsen. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Kristen Van Fossan. (tba) Modified on 10/5/2020 (tba).
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen N. Van Fossan on behalf of Kenneth Madsen (Van Fossan, Kristen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Kristen N. Van Fossan does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-981-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (rah)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kenneth Madsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit original filing form)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madsen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH MADSEN
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?