McGinnis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carol A McGinnis and Carol A. McGinnis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00983
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Schultz, Barry)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: In a continued effort to equalize the distribution of cases in this judicial district (see Administrative Order No. 277), effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed before the filing of Defendants brief. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. Magistrate Judge Daly no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 20-983-JPG.(mar)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, and returned to Attorney Schultz. (kls3)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carol A. McGinnis. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/28/2020. (jdh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-983-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kls3)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carol A McGinnis. (Schultz, Barry)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A. Schultz on behalf of Carol A McGinnis (Schultz, Barry)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Carol A McGinnis. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGinnis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A McGinnis
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. McGinnis
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?